EP3201937 - ELECTRON BEAM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMET Technologies USA Inc. 100 Trap Falls Road EXT Shelton CT 06484 / US | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUNWALD, Rily Carl 220 S. 27th Avenue Eldridge, IA 52748 / US | 02 /
DRENTER, John Charles 22124 Territorial Road Davenport, IA 52807 / US | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 15846080.8 | 29.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015US52837 | Priority number, date | US201414501815 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: US201414501815 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016053972 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201937 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/86 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
G21F3/00 (EP,US);
G21F1/08 (EP,US);
G21K5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONENSTRAHLSYSTEM | [2017/32] | English: | ELECTRON BEAM SYSTEM | [2017/32] | French: | SYSTÈME À FAISCEAU D'ÉLECTRONS | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 11.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002018542 (FENKART GERHARD [CH], et al) [Y] 9* paragraphs [0198] - [0204] *; | [IA]JP2004191307 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [I] 1,3-5 * abstract * [A] 10,11; | [XAYI]JP2005043665 (CANON KK) [X] 1,3-5,7,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0025] - [0027] , [0028] , [0030] , [0040] * [A] 10,11 [Y] 6,8,9 [I] 2,14,15; | [Y]US2010230618 (DRENTER JOHN [US]) [Y] 6,8 * paragraph [0096] * | International search | [XY]US2010230618 (DRENTER JOHN [US]) [X] 1-18, 20-26, 29-38 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0065], [0090]-[0124], claim 55 and figures 2A, 2B, 3B, 5B, 9A, 9G, 11B. * [Y] 19, 27, 28; | [Y]US2005184256 (CHAUHAN SUNDEEP [US], et al) [Y] 19, 27, 28 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0031], claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2010026161 (IIJIMA EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-38 * See paragraphs [0044]-[0063], claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2006124866 (HISATSUGU TOKUSHIGE [JP]) [A] 1-38 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0048], claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2005214709 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-38 * See paragraphs [0008]-[0047], claim 1 and figure 1. * |