EP3230132 - SMARTKEY APPARATUSES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wadhwani, Romesh 26170 West Fremont Road Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US | For all designated states Walworth, Kyle Francis 4912 Birdie Lane Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US | For all designated states Searle, Mark Douglas 22 Ormonde Road Wokingham RG41 2RB / GB | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Ungerer, Olaf, et al Page White & Farrer Germany LLP Widenmayerstraße 10 80538 München / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15866710.5 | 12.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015US65414 | Priority number, date | US201462091267P | 12.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462091267 P | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016094886 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3230132 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, B60R25/10, B60R1/02, E05B81/54, E05B47/00, H04L9/32, H04L9/08, B60R25/24, B60L11/18, G08C17/02, G07C9/00, H04W4/80, G06F21/35, H04L29/06, B60R25/25, B60R25/20 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
B60L53/65 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (US);
B60R25/2081 (EP,US);
B60R25/24 (EP,US);
B60R25/25 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06F21/35 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00984 (US);
G07C9/00571 (EP,US);
G07C9/00896 (EP,US);
G07C9/26 (US);
H04L63/0838 (EP,US);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (US);
Y02T90/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | B60R25/10, B60R1/02, E05B81/54, E05B47/00, H04L9/32, H04L9/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | SMARTKEY-VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME | [2017/42] | English: | SMARTKEY APPARATUSES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2017/42] | French: | APPAREILS, PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE SMARTKEY | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 31.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2012159152 (HA DONG-SIK [KR], et al) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0045] * [A] 1-7,10-21; | [A]US2012167071 (PAEK JANG WOON [KR]) [A] 1-21 * abstract ** paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US2012212322 (IDSOEE TORE ETHOLM [NO]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [YA]US2013040620 (VAN WIEMEERSCH JOHN ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0081] * [A] 5-7,21; | [YA]US2014232521 (KAWAMURA DAISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0064] * [A] 5-7,21 | International search | [A]US2008059806 (KISHIDA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * See abstract and paragraphs [0031]-[0042]. *; | [A]US2008074234 (NELSON ROBERT [CA]) [A] 1-21* See paragraphs [0017]-[0027] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]US2012159152 (HA DONG-SIK [KR], et al) [Y] 8-9 * See abstract and paragraphs [0035]-[0045]. *; | [Y]US2013040620 (VAN WIEMEERSCH JOHN ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 8-20 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0025], [0081]. *; | [YA]US2014232521 (KAWAMURA DAISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4, 8-20 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0033], [0054]-[0064] and figures 1, 3, 7. * [A] 5-7, 21 |