EP3233250 - GAS SCAVENGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexion Research Belgium SA Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Ottignies-Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Hexion Research Belgium SA Avenue Jean Monnet, 1 Ottignies 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMOUN, Cyrille Hexion Inc. 15366 Park Row Houston, TX 77084 / US | 02 /
BEETGE, Jan Hexion Inc. 15366 Park Row Houston, TX 77084 / US | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 15870811.5 | 14.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015US65596 | Priority number, date | US201462093924P | 18.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462093924 P | US201562235158P | 30.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562235158 P | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016100224 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3233250 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/48, C10L3/10 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
B01D53/1468 (EP,US);
B01D53/52 (US);
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
B01D53/48 (RU);
B01J20/22 (EP,US);
C10L3/103 (EP,US);
C10L3/106 (EP,US);
B01D2251/80 (EP,US);
B01D2252/202 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20415 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20426 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20431 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20436 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20484 (EP,US);
B01D2252/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | B01D53/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | GASBINDER | [2017/43] | English: | GAS SCAVENGERS | [2017/43] | French: | PIÉGEURS DE GAZ | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 22.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6126911 (SCRANTON JR DELBERT C [US]) [X] 1-3, 6, 8, 11, 12, 14, 20 * entire document * [Y] 4, 5, 7, 9, 10, 13, 15-19; | [Y]US6156102 (CONRAD WAYNE ERNEST [CA], et al) [Y] 4, 9, 10 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013004393 (MENENDEZ CARLOS M [US], et al) [Y] 5, 7, 13, 15-19* entire document * |