EP3235243 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING AND USING CAMERA DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Light Labs Inc. 636 Ramona Street Palo Alto CA 94301 / US | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHROFF, Sapna, A. 1000 Escalon Avenue Apt. O-1119 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 02 /
LAROIA, Rajiv 7 Springcroft Road Far Hills, NJ 07931 / US | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15871137.4 | 17.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015US66532 | Priority number, date | US201462093405P | 17.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462093405 P | US201562238046P | 06.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562238046 P | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016100756 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235243 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/45 (EP,US);
H04N23/54 (EP,US);
H04N23/60 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | H04N5/33, G03B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON KAMERAVORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/43] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING AND USING CAMERA DEVICES | [2017/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE ET UTILISER DES DISPOSITIFS D'APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 12.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2006187338 (MAY MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,7-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * figures 24A,B * [A] 1,2,5,6,10-15; | [XA]US2012149981 (KHAIT SEMION [IL], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0116] * * figures 13A, 15 * [A] 2-14; | [IAY]WO2012153281 (SISVEL TECHNOLOGY SRL [IT], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6,10 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - line 13 * * page 10, line 6 - page 11, line 23 * * figures 1-9b * [A] 11-15 [Y] 3,4,7-9; | [A]US2013258044 (BETTS-LACROIX JONATHAN N [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0035] ** figures 1-19 * | International search | [Y]US4890133 (OGAWA RYOTA [JP], et al) [Y] 7, 9, 10-14 * , fig. 1 *; | [Y]US2007127915 (LU JIUN-NAN [TW], et al) [Y] 1-18 * , abstract, fig. 1, [0005] *; | [Y]US2008180562 (KOBAYASHI FUTOSHI [JP]) [Y] 3, 4, 13 * , fig. 3, 7 *; | [Y]US2012188391 (SMITH SCOTT [US]) [Y] 15 * , fig. 6, [0023], [0024] *; | [Y]US2013250125 (GARROW STANLEY H [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * , fig. 17, [0227], [0231] *; | [Y]US2014152802 (OLSSON MARK S [US], et al) [Y] 18* , fig. 9, [0067] * |