EP3211743 - ISLAND-TO-NETWORK SWITCHING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NR Electric Co., Ltd. No.69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing, Jiangsu 211102 / CN | For all designated states NR Engineering Co., Ltd No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing, Jiangsu 211102 / CN | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONG, Yunlong No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing Jiangsu 211102 / CN | 02 /
TIAN, Jie No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing Jiangsu 211102 / CN | 03 /
HU, Zhaoqing No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing Jiangsu 211102 / CN | 04 /
LI, Haiying No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing Jiangsu 211102 / CN | 05 /
CAO, Dongming No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing Jiangsu 211102 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Haibin No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing Jiangsu 211102 / CN | 07 /
LU, Yu No. 69 Suyuan Avenue Jiangning District Nanjing Jiangsu 211102 / CN | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 15871856.9 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015CN96747 | Priority number, date | CN201410812231 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410812231 | [2017/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016101787 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3211743 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3211743 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/36, H02J3/38, H02H7/122 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H02J3/36 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H02H7/1222 (RU,US);
H02J3/38 (CN,KR,RU,US);
H02J3/388 (EP,CN,US);
H02J3/48 (EP);
H02J3/50 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02J1/04 (EP);
H02M1/36 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/35] | H02J3/36, H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISLAND-TO-NETWORK-SCHALTVERFAHREN | [2017/35] | English: | ISLAND-TO-NETWORK SWITCHING METHOD | [2017/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION D'ÎLOT À RÉSEAU | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2017 | Translation filed | 24.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 24.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2015 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | LU | 09.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
LU | 09.12.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008084643 (FLOTTEMESCH JORG [DE], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0026] - [0031]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]CN103647286 (XUJI GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]CN103904676 (UNIV ZHEJIANG) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]CN102255329 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [A] 1-6 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102403735 (TIANJIN ELECTRIC POWER CORP, et al) [A] 1-6 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102510124 (BEIJING JINFENG KECHUANG WIND POWER EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2014103727 (TAIMELA PASI [US], et al) [A] 1-6* , the whole document *; | [PX]CN104485683 (NARI RELAYS ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-6 * , claims 1-6 * |