EP3251343 - ROOM CAPTURE AND PROJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ent. Services Development Corporation LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAILPERN, Joshua 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | 02 /
ALLEN, William, J 1070 NE Circle Boulevard Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | 03 /
COOPER, James, C 3406 S. Rogers Street Bloomington, Indiana 47403 / US | 04 /
MCCORRY, Kieran 41 Osborne Park Malone Road Belfast Armagh BT9 6JP / GB | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/49] | 01 /
HAILPERN, Joshua 1160 Enterprise Way Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | ||
02 /
ALLEN, William, J 1070 NE Circle Boulevard Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | |||
03 /
COOPER, James, C 3406 S. Rogers Street Bloomington, Indiana 47403 / US | |||
04 /
MCCORRY, Kieran 41 Osborne Park Malone Road Belfast Armagh BT9 6JP / GB | Representative(s) | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15880474.0 | 30.01.2015 | [2017/49] | WO2015US13738 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016122580 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3251343 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15, H04N5/74 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
H04M3/567 (EP,US);
H04N9/3194 (US);
H04N5/74 (EP,US);
H04N7/15 (US);
H04N7/157 (EP,US);
H04M2203/1025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Title | German: | RAUMERFASSUNG UND PROJEKTION | [2017/49] | English: | ROOM CAPTURE AND PROJECTION | [2017/49] | French: | CAPTURE ET PROJECTION DE SALLE | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 29.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/23] | 01.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 17.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2018 | 31.01.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012223885 (PEREZ GRITSKO [US]) [A] 1,9,13* paragraphs [0012] - [0032]; figure - *; | [I]JP2013250897 (SHARP KK) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0067] - [0073] - [0085] - [0105] , [0122] - [0126] - [0150] , [0151] , [0166] - [0168] - [0224]; figure - *; | [A]US2014028789 (BENTLEY JON LOUIS [US], et al) [A] 1,9,13 * abstract *; | [XI] - ROBINSON J A ET AL, "The LivePaper system: augmenting paper on an enhanced tabletop", COMPUTERS AND GRAPH, ELSEVIER, GB, (20011001), vol. 25, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0097-8493(01)00116-9, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 731 - 743, XP004318019 [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [I] 3-8,10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0097-8493(01)00116-9 | [XI] - ANDREI SHERSTYUK ET AL, "Virtual Roommates in multiple shared spaces", VR INNOVATION (ISVRI), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20110319), doi:10.1109/ISVRI.2011.5759607, ISBN 978-1-4577-0055-2, pages 81 - 88, XP031861031 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISVRI.2011.5759607 | [T] - Anonymous, "Augmented reality - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20101013), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Augmented_reality&oldid=390523141#Notable_researchers, (20160121), XP055243511 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - STEVE BENFORD ET AL, "Understanding and Constructing Shared Spaces with Mixed-Reality Boundaries", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER-HUMAN INTERACTION, (199809), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 185 - 223, XP040098616 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2004347871 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 13-15 * See paragraphs [0017], [0023]-[0024], [0063] and figures 1-3, 11. *; | [A]US2009102835 (MIKHAILOV ANTON [US]) [A] 1-15* See paragraph [0039] and figures 5A-5D. *; | [Y]US2012320158 (JUNUZOVIC SASA [US], et al) [Y] 4-8 * See paragraphs [0059], [0110] and figures 5, 10. *; | [Y]EP2667615 (ST ERICSSON SA [CH]) [Y] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0005], [0044]-[0045], [0061] and figures 2a-2b. *; | [A]US2014253692 (WILSON ANDREW DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0071] and figures 1-3. *; | [YA] - SCOTT R. KLEMMER et al., "Where Do Web Sites Come From? Capturing and Interacting with Design History", CHI '02 Proceedings of the SIGCHI Conference on Human Factors in Computing Systems, Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA, (20020420), vol. 4, no. Issue 1, pages 1 - 8, XP058357572 [Y] 1-9, 13-15 * See pages 1-3. * [A] 10-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/503376.503378 | by applicant | US2014139426 | - "The LivePaper system: augmenting paper on an enhanced tabletop", ROBINSON J A et al., COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, ELSEVIER, (20011001), vol. 25, pages 731 - 743 |