EP3251130 - IRON NITRIDE MAGNETIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/49] | APPLIED MAGNETIC FIELD SYNTHESIS AND PROCESSING OF IRON NITRIDE MAGNETIC MATERIALS | ||
[2020/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regents of the University of Minnesota 600 McNamara Alumni Center 200 Oak Street S.E. Minneapolis, MN 55455 / US | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jian-Ping 1369 Woodcrest Avenue Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Yanfeng 1040 6th Street SE Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | [2020/29] |
Former [2017/49] | 01 /
WANG, Jian-Ping 1369 Woodcrest Avenue Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | ||
02 /
JIANG, Yanfeng 1040 6th Street SE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55414 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2017/49] | chapman + co 18 Staple Gardens Winchester, Hampshire SO23 8SR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15880599.4 | 22.07.2015 | [2017/49] | WO2015US41532 | Priority number, date | US201562107700P | 26.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562107700 P | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016122712 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3251130 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3251130 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/02, H01F1/08, H01F1/06, H01F1/047 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
H01F41/0273 (EP,US);
H01F1/04 (KR);
B22D27/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
H01F1/047 (EP,US);
H01F1/06 (US);
H01F1/08 (EP,US);
H01F41/0266 (KR,US);
H01F7/02 (KR);
H02K1/02 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/47] | H01F41/02, H01F1/08, H01F1/06 | ||
Former IPC [2017/49] | H01F1/04, H01F41/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EISENNITRIDMAGNETMATERIALIEN | [2020/09] | English: | IRON NITRIDE MAGNETIC MATERIALS | [2020/09] | French: | MATÉRIAUX MAGNÉTIQUES À BASE DE NITRURE DE FER | [2020/09] |
Former [2017/49] | SYNTHESE EINES ANGELEGTEN MAGNETFELDES UND VERARBEITUNG VON EISENNITRIDMAGNETMATERIALIEN | ||
Former [2017/49] | APPLIED MAGNETIC FIELD SYNTHESIS AND PROCESSING OF IRON NITRIDE MAGNETIC MATERIALS | ||
Former [2017/49] | SYNTHÈSE DE CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE APPLIQUÉ ET TRAITEMENT DE MATÉRIAUX MAGNÉTIQUES À BASE DE NITRURE DE FER | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 28.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 28.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2015 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | IT | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | TR | 15.07.2020 | IE | 22.07.2020 | LU | 22.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 22.07.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.07.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2013026007 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * paragraphs [0057] - [0064]; figures 4,5a,5b *; | [AD]WO2014124135 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) [AD] 1-16 * paragraphs [0128] - [0130] *; | [XYI] - Y-C. Shih, "Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory Recent Work Title THE OBSERVATION OF THE HABIT PLANE SHIFT AND THE MORPHOLOGY OF a"" NITRIDE (Fe16N2) PRECIPITATE IN a-Fe", Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory Recent Work Title THE OBSERVATION OF THE HABIT PLANE SHIFT AND THE MORPHOLOGY OF a"" NITRIDE (Fe16N2) PRECIPITATE IN a-Fe, (19820601), XP055511910 [X] 1-3,5,6,13,15 * figure 6 * [Y] 7-11,16 [I] 4,12 | [XYI] - WATANABE Y ET AL, "Effect of magnetic fields on the formation of Fe"1"6N"2 precipitates in Fe@?N alloys", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING: A, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 146, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0921-5093(91)90274-Q, ISSN 0921-5093, (19911025), pages 151 - 160, (19911025), XP024169580 [X] 1-3,5,6,13-15 * abstract * * page 152, column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 7-11,16 [I] 4,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0921-5093(91)90274-Q | [Y] - JIANG YANFENG ET AL, "9 T high magnetic field annealing effects on FeN bulk sample", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, vol. 115, no. 17, doi:10.1063/1.4868493, ISSN 0021-8979, (20140507), (19010101), XP012183191 [Y] 7-11,16 * abstract * * pages 17A758-1, column 1, paragraph 1 * * pages 17A758-3, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 2; figure 2; tables I,II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4868493 | [A] - MIGAKU TAKAHASHI ET AL, "MAGNETIC MOMENT OF -FE16N2 FILMS (INVITED)", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (19941115), vol. 76, no. 10, PART 02, doi:10.1063/1.358431, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 6642 - 6647, XP000508806 [A] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.358431 | International search | [A]JP2009259402 (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-3, 17-19, 31, 40-42 , 69-72 * See abstract and claims 1-3. *; | [XA]US2011074531 (YAMASHITA FUMITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * See paragraphs [0103], [0106] and claim 1. * [A] 17-19, 31, 40-42 , 69-72; | [A]WO2012159096 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 17-19, 31, 40-42 , 69-72 * See abstract and claims 1-4. *; | [A]US2013140076 (LEE SANG-KWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-3, 17-19, 31, 40-42 , 69-42* See paragraph [0005] and claims 1,11,15-25. *; | [X] - J.M.D. COEY et al., "Magnetic nitrides", Journal of Magnetism and Magnetic Materials, vol. 200, no. Issues 1-3, (19991000), pages 405 - 424, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0304885399004291, XP004364026 [X] 17-19, 31, 40-42 , 69-72 * See pages 406,410,415-416,421. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(99)00429-1 | Examination | JP2012253248 | by applicant | - YOSHIMI WATANABE et al., "Effect of magnetic fields on the formation of Fei N precipitates in FeN alloys", Materials Science and Engineering, (19911025), vol. 146, no. 1-2, pages 151 - 160 | - JIANG YANFENG et al., "9 T high magnetic field annealing effects of FeN bulk sample", Journal of Applied Physics, (20140507), vol. 115, no. 7 | WO2012US51382 | WO2014US15104 | WO2014US43902 |