EP3249062 - METHOD FOR RECOVERING SCANDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Mining Co., Ltd. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUMA, Ryoma c/o Niihama Research Laboratories SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 02 /
HIGAKI, Tatsuya c/o Niihama Research Laboratories SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 03 /
NAGAI, Hidemasa c/o Niihama Research Laboratories SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 04 /
ASANO, Satoshi c/o Niihama Research Laboratories SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 05 /
KOBAYASHI, Hiroshi c/o Niihama Research Laboratories SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London, SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15881203.2 | 08.12.2015 | [2017/48] | WO2015JP84411 | Priority number, date | JP20150018427 | 02.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015018427 | [2017/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016125386 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3249062 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3249062 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22B59/00, C22B3/26, C22B3/42, C22B3/44 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
C22B3/382 (EP);
C22B59/00 (EP,KR,US);
C22B3/42 (EP,KR,US);
C22B3/22 (US);
C22B3/44 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON SCANDIUM | [2017/48] | English: | METHOD FOR RECOVERING SCANDIUM | [2017/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE SCANDIUM | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2017 | Translation filed | 16.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 16.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2015 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | ES | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | IT | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3208352 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [E] 1,2* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH08232026 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1, 2 * , claim 5; paragraph [0015] (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09248463 (PACIFIC METALS CO LTD) [A] 1, 2 * , claims; paragraphs [0018], [0022] (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2015115269 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [PA] 1, 2* , claims; paragraphs [0065], [0080] & JP 2015-163729 A * |