EP3288682 - SEALING MILL LINER BOLT FASTENINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarke, Ronald C. 1825 S. 27th Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85008 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2021/51] |
Former [2018/10] | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15890996.0 | 01.05.2015 | [2018/10] | WO2015US28763 | Priority number, date | US201514700247 | 30.04.2015 Original published format: US201514700247 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016175867 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3288682 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3288682 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/22, F16J15/06, F16B33/00 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
B02C17/22 (EP,US);
F16B33/004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | B02C17/22, F16J15/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FRÄSFUTTERBOLZENBEFESTIGUNGEN MIT DICHTUNGSELEMENT | [2018/10] | English: | SEALING MILL LINER BOLT FASTENINGS | [2018/10] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS DE FIXATION ÉTANCHE DE BOULON POUR REVÊTEMENT DE BROYEUR | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 25.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.05.2015 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | MT | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | TR | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | GB | 01.05.2022 | IE | 01.05.2022 | LU | 01.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | FR | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.05.2015 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
TR | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 01.05.2022 | ||
IE | 01.05.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.05.2015 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 01.05.2022 | ||
IE | 01.05.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 01.05.2015 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 01.05.2022 | ||
IE | 01.05.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.05.2015 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 01.05.2022 | ||
IE | 01.05.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 01.05.2022 | ||
IE | 01.05.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 01.05.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 01.05.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
FR | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 01.05.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 01.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6048150 (CLARKE RONALD C [US]) [X] 1-8,10,12 * column 2, lines 25-29,36 - column 3, line 46; figures 7,9,10,12,14,17,19,20 * * column 5, lines 44-59 * * column 6, lines 9-60 * [Y] 9,11; | [YA]US4230326 (WHITE LEONARD D) [Y] 9,11 * column 1, lines 25-55; figures 1,5-8 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 37 * [A] 1; | [A]US3519279 (WAGNER DAVID P) [A] 1,9,11 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 32; figures 6-11,1,3,4 * | International search | [Y]US6241444 (CLARKE RONALD C [US]) [Y] 19-23 * ; figures 7, 9; column 3, lines 15-30; column 5, lines 50-60 *; | [Y]CN202427510U (JIANGXI RARE EARTH & RARE MET) [Y] 19-23 * ; figure 4; paragraphs [0001]-[0005], [0016]-[0018] *; | [A]US2003230176 (FUERLE RICHARD D [US]) [A] 1-23 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2010101201 (YANKE BRYAN RAY [US]) [A] 1-23 * ; entire document *; | [A]US1918107 (JOINER SYLVESTER L) [A] 1-23 * ; entire document *; | [A]US3582007 (HEIGHBERGER ROBERT N) [A] 1-23 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2011173920 (YAU PAK SUM [CN]) [A] 1-23 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2011121153 (MAGNO JR JOEY D [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * , entire document *; | [A]US2009191024 (NEUDORF BLAKE [CA]) [A] 1-23 * ; entire document * | by applicant | US6048150 |