EP3358603 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 2-24, Toyosu 3-chome Koutou-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Masahiro c/o Renesas Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 751 Horiguchi Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | 02 /
ICHINOSE, Kazuhito c/o Renesas Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 751 Horiguchi Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | 03 /
YAJIMA, Akira c/o Renesas Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 751 Horiguchi Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15905451.9 | 01.10.2015 | [2018/32] | WO2015JP77970 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017056297 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358603 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3205, H01L21/768, H01L23/522, H01L23/00 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
H01L24/06 (EP);
H01L21/3205 (KR,US);
H01L21/768 (KR,US);
H01L23/522 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/02166 (EP);
H01L2224/02311 (EP,US);
H01L2224/02331 (EP,US);
H01L2224/02377 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0346 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0347 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0391 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05 (KR,US);
H01L2224/05008 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05018 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05024 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05124 (EP);
H01L2224/05139 (EP);
H01L2224/05144 (EP);
H01L2224/05147 (EP);
H01L2224/05155 (EP);
H01L2224/05164 (EP);
H01L2224/05166 (EP);
H01L2224/05171 (EP);
H01L2224/05181 (EP);
H01L2224/05186 (EP);
H01L2224/05567 (EP);
H01L2224/05582 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05639 (EP);
H01L2224/05644 (EP);
H01L2224/05647 (EP);
H01L2224/05664 (EP);
H01L2224/06131 (EP,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/45099 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/814 (EP);
H01L2224/854 (EP);
H01L23/3157 (EP,US);
H01L23/562 (EP,US);
H01L23/564 (EP,US);
H01L24/03 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05124, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05139, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05144, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05147, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05155, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05164, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05166, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05171, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05181, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05186, H01L2924/04941, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05639, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05644, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05647, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05664, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/45099, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/814, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/854, H01L2924/00014 (EP); |
Former IPC [2018/32] | H01L21/3205, H01L21/768, H01L23/522 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/32] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2018 | Translation filed | 21.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 09.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 17.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2012074534 (LIN YAOJIAN [SG], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 40] - [0060]; figures 5c, 7a, 8a, 9 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 9,10,12; | [Y]US2013181329 (WADA HAJIME [JP]) [Y] 5* figure 14 *; | [XYI]US2015228587 (CHENG JUNG WEI [TW], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0029] - [0 42]; figures 1-5, 11 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 10,12; | [Y]US2015255420 (SAITO KENTARO [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0059] - [0071]; figures 9-11 * | International search | [Y]JP2010192867 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-28 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0144] & US 2010/0181650 A1 paragraphs [0055] to [0190] & TW 201030915 A *; | [A]JP2010278040 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1-28 * , & US 2010/0301459 A1 *; | [A]JP2013058584 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1-28* , & US 2013/0062777 A1 *; | [Y]JP2014165403 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-28 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0207] & US 2015/0162284 A1 paragraphs [0050] to [0238] & CN 104009024 A & TW 201442165 A *; | [Y]JP2015170778 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-28 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0091] (Family: none) * |