EP3369687 - ELEVATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE Takashi c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA Masato c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
SATOU Gorou c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/29] |
Former [2018/36] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15907188.5 | 26.10.2015 | [2018/36] | WO2015JP80057 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017072824 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369687 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3369687 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/08, F16D55/06, F16D65/092, B66B5/02 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
B66B5/02 (EP);
B66B11/08 (KR);
F16D55/06 (EP,KR);
F16D65/092 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | B66B11/08, F16D55/06, F16D65/092 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/36] | English: | ELEVATOR DEVICE | [2018/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASCENSEUR | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2018 | Translation filed | 24.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 24.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2018 | Observations by third parties | 22.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS55132074U ; | [A]JPH09104572 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US2008296098 (SATO GORO [JP], et al); | [X]WO2015068183 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPS56138234U ; | [Y]JPS6237635U ; | [Y]JPH0326842U ; | [Y]JP2009274834 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2011126679 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2012188176 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2013112431 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | other | JPS56138234U | DE3832199 | JPH05296269 | EP0770791 | EP1311776 | WO2015003703 | EP2827017 | WO2015068183 |