EP3386030 - ANTENNA APPARATUS AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hanyang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LEE, Chien-Ming Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Xuefei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
YING, Lijun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
XUE, Liang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
YOU, Jiaqing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 08 /
SHI, Yue Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 09 /
YU, Dong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 10 /
WU, Guoping Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 11 /
HUANG, Bo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15911898.3 | 31.12.2015 | [2018/41] | WO2015CN100065 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017113270 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3386030 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3386030 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/42, H01Q5/314, H01Q5/328, H01Q5/371, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/38, // H01Q1/22, H01Q1/27 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q13/18 (US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/50 (US);
H01Q5/314 (EP,US);
H01Q5/328 (EP,US);
H01Q5/371 (EP,US);
H01Q9/42 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2266 (EP,US);
H01Q1/273 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/01] | H01Q9/42, H01Q5/314, H01Q5/328, H01Q5/371, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/38, H01Q1/22, H01Q1/27 | ||
Former IPC [2018/41] | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄT | [2018/41] | English: | ANTENNA APPARATUS AND TERMINAL | [2018/41] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANTENNE ET TERMINAL | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2018 | Translation filed | 03.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 03.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.12.2015 | AL | 10.08.2022 | AT | 10.08.2022 | BG | 10.08.2022 | CY | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | IT | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | MK | 10.08.2022 | MT | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | TR | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | FR | 31.12.2022 | IE | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | LU | 31.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 31.12.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
BG | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
TR | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 31.12.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
TR | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 31.12.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 31.12.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 31.12.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 31.12.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008158074 (VILLARROEL WLADIMIRO [US], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0024] , [0034] - [0036]; figure 1 *; | [I]WO2011076582 (LITE ON MOBILE OYJ [FI], et al) [I] 9-13 * figures 2,3a,3c,5-7 * * page 1, line 4 - line 29 * * page 2, line 9 - line 12 * * page 6, line 14 - page 9, line 15 * * page 17, line 28 - page 18, line 25 * * page 27, line 24 - line 27 *; | [XA]EP2479838 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1 * figure all * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0030] * [A] 2-8; | [A]US2012262347 (TIANG SHOUDONG [CN]) [A] 9-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0063] ** figure 2 *; | [I]US2014057578 (CHAN SHIH-YI [TW], et al) [I] 1-8 * figures 1b,4,5c * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]WO2014030031 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 9-13 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 10 - line 12 * * page 5, line 25 - page 10, line 7 * * figures 2a,2b,3,6 *; | [I]US2015054698 (KERR DANIEL CHARLES [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0010] , [0026] - [0028] - [0034]; figures 2,6a *; | [I]US2015057054 (SU WEI-CHENG [TW], et al) [I] 9,10,13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] *; | [A]WO2015109943 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | Examination | WO2015165007 | US2017047642 |