Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3190767

EP3190767 - TECHNIQUE FOR DETECTING MALICIOUS ELECTRONIC MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
retarus GmbH
Aschauer Strasse 30
81549 München / DE
[2017/28]
Inventor(s)01 / HAGER, Martin
Rechpacherstr. 12
80689 München / DE
02 / GRAUVOGL, Michael
Trappentreustr. 27
80339 München / DE
 [2017/28]
Representative(s)Lambacher, Michael , et al
V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano
Postfach 95 01 60
81517 München / DE
[2018/50]
Former [2017/28]Lambacher, Michael , et al
Euromarkpat
V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano
Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date16150573.008.01.2016
[2017/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3190767
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3190767
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/58, G06F17/30, // G06F21/64, G06F21/56
[2018/28]
Former International [2017/28]H04L29/06, // G06F21/64, G06F21/56
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
Former [2017/28]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON BÖSARTIGEN ELEKTRONISCHEN NACHRICHTEN[2017/28]
English:TECHNIQUE FOR DETECTING MALICIOUS ELECTRONIC MESSAGES[2017/28]
French:TECHNIQUE DE DÉTECTION DE MESSAGES ÉLECTRONIQUES MALVEILLANTS[2017/28]
Examination procedure08.01.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/33]
08.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.09.2018Fee for grant paid
14.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US7539871  (OSBORN KEVIN G [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 5, lines 23-26; 37-38; * * column 6, lines 17-22; 46-50; 64-67; * * column 8, lines 16-19; 56-57 * * column 9, lines 25-27; 64-67; * * figures 1, 5 *;
 [A]US2008086772  (CHESLA AVI [IL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [ 0013] , [ 0053] , [ 0058] * * paragraphs [0076] , [ 0155] , [ 0158] , [ 0174] * * paragraphs [0187] , [ 0188] , [ 0189] , [ 0190] * * paragraphs [0221] , [ 0228] *