EP3051047 - HINGE CONSTRUCTION FOR GALLEY CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zodiac Aircatering Equipment Europe B.V. Toermalijnstraat 16 1812 RL Alkmaar / NL | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Portegies, Cornelis Petrus Maria Hoefje 20 1733 AC Nieuwe Niedorp / NL | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 16153834.3 | 02.02.2016 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | NL20152014218 | 02.02.2015 Original published format: NL 2014218 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3051047 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05D3/12 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
E05D3/12 (EP,CN,US);
B65D43/167 (US);
E05D5/02 (CN);
E05D5/10 (CN);
E05D2005/106 (CN);
E05Y2900/602 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARNIERANORDNUNG FÜR BORDKÜCHENBEHÄLTER | [2016/31] | English: | HINGE CONSTRUCTION FOR GALLEY CONTAINER | [2016/31] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CHARNIÈRE POUR CONTENEUR DE CUISINE | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 28.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0330056 (ROMAY AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-11,14,15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 4-18 * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 25 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 3 * * figure - * [I] 3,4,12,13; | [A]FR2699587 (OLIVO [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 2-12 * * page 3, lines 6-24 ** figures 1, 2 * |