EP3053583 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING REDUCED FOLATES FOR USE IN TREATING THYROID-RELATED MEDICAL CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/32] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING THYROID-RELATED MEDICAL CONDITIONS WITH REDUCED FOLATES | ||
[2020/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scott III, Linzy O. 940 Regency Crest Drive Atlanta, GA 30331 / US | [2020/21] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Scott III, Linzy O. 940 Regency Crest Drive Atlanta, GA 30331 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/21] |
Former [2016/32] | 01 /
Scott III, Linzy O 940 Regency Crest Drive Atlanta, Georgia 30331 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/42] |
Former [2016/32] | Gordon, Jennifer Claire Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16154294.9 | 09.07.2010 | [2016/32] | Priority number, date | US20090270615P | 10.07.2009 Original published format: US 270615 P | US20090270741P | 13.07.2009 Original published format: US 270741 P | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3053583 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3053583 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61K31/205, A61K31/593, A61K31/714, A61K33/06, A61K33/26, A61K45/06, A61P5/14, A61P7/06, A61P1/16, A61P43/00 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/198 (IL,KR);
A61K31/205 (EP,BR,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/59 (BR,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/593 (EP,BR,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7056 (BR,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/714 (EP,BR,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K33/26 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,BR,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/02 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP,IL);
A61P5/14 (EP,IL);
A61P5/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/205, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/593, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/714, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2016/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND REDUZIERTE FOLATE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON SCHILDDRÜSENBEDINGTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2020/21] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING REDUCED FOLATES FOR USE IN TREATING THYROID-RELATED MEDICAL CONDITIONS | [2020/20] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES FOLATES RÉDUITS POUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE CONDITIONS MÉDICALES ASSOCIÉES À LA THYROÏDE | [2020/20] |
Former [2016/32] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHILDDRÜSENBEDINGTEN ERKRANKUNGEN MIT REDUZIERTEN FOLATEN | ||
Former [2016/32] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING THYROID-RELATED MEDICAL CONDITIONS WITH REDUCED FOLATES | ||
Former [2016/32] | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE CONDITIONS MÉDICALES ASSOCIÉES À LA THYROÏDE AVEC FOLATES RÉDUITS | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10797960.1 / EP2451299 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2010 | AL | 14.10.2020 | AT | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | ES | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | IT | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | NL | 14.10.2020 | PL | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | NO | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | LU | 09.07.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
LU | 09.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - RAMAEKERS V ET AL, "Psychomotor Retardation, Spastic Paraplegia, Cerebellar Ataxia and Dyskinesia Associated with Low 5-Methyltetrahydrofolate in Cerebrospinal Fluid: A Novel Neurometabolic Condition Responding to Folinic Acid Substitution", NEUROPEDIATRICS, HIPPOKRATES VERLAG, STUTTGART, DE, (20020101), vol. 33, ISSN 0174-304X, pages 301 - 308, XP007923045 [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2002-37082 | [XY] - NEIL GORDON, "Cerebral folate deficiency", DEVELOPMENTAL MEDICINE AND CHILD NEUROLOGY, GB, (20090301), vol. 51, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1469-8749.2008.03185.x, ISSN 0012-1622, pages 180 - 182, XP055267703 [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1469-8749.2008.03185.x | [XPYI] - HENRI BLEHAUT ET AL, "Effect of Leucovorin (Folinic Acid) on the Developmental Quotient of Children with Down's Syndrome (Trisomy 21) and Influence of Thyroid Status", PLOS ONE, (20100111), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0008394, page e8394, XP055267923 [XP] 1,4,6-8 * abstract * [Y] 13-15 [I] 2,3,5,9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0008394 | [Y] - JABBAR A ET AL, "Vitamin B12 deficiency common in primary hypothyroidism", PAKISTAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION. JOURNAL, PAKISTAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, KARACHI, PK, (20080501), vol. 58, no. 5, ISSN 0030-9982, pages 258 - 261, XP002686657 [Y] 13-15 * abstract * | [Y] - "Support for Underactive Thyroid Gland", INTERNET CITATION, (20090531), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20090531174357/http://www.health4youonline.com/article_underacvtive_thyroid.htm, (20121107), XP002686670 [Y] 13-15 * page 2, paragraph 2nd par. * | Examination | US4205126 | - RAMAEKERS VINCENT TH ET AL, "Cerebral folate deficiency", DEVELOPMENTAL MEDICINE & CHILD NEUROLOGY, (200412), vol. 46, no. 12, ISSN 0012-1622, pages 843 - 851 | - email from Dr Ramaekers dated 19.11.2008 |