EP3208972 - METHOD FOR ENHANCED TRACING AND/OR MONITORING OF THE NETWORK NODES OF A COMMUNICATION NETWORK, COMMUNICATION NETWORK, A PLURALITY OF VIRTUAL MACHINES, VIRTUALIZED NETWORK FUNCTION MANAGER FUNCTIONALITY, PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBANIA, Alexander Weimarstraße 47 53757 Sankt Augustin / DE | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2019/51] |
Former [2017/34] | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 16155815.0 | 16.02.2016 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208972 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208972 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/24, H04W24/08 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
H04L41/145 (EP,US);
H04L43/12 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/45558 (CN);
H04L41/12 (EP,US);
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L43/04 (EP,US);
H04L43/10 (EP,US);
H04L43/14 (EP,US);
H04L43/20 (EP);
H04L43/55 (EP,US);
H04W24/06 (US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
G06F2009/45595 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] |
Former [2017/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN VERFOLGUNG UND/ODER ÜBERWACHUNG DES NETZKNOTEN EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKS, KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK, MEHRERE VIRTUELLE MASCHINEN, VIRTUALISIERTE NETZWERKFUNKTIONSMANAGERFUNKTIONALITÄT, PROGRAMM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2017/34] | English: | METHOD FOR ENHANCED TRACING AND/OR MONITORING OF THE NETWORK NODES OF A COMMUNICATION NETWORK, COMMUNICATION NETWORK, A PLURALITY OF VIRTUAL MACHINES, VIRTUALIZED NETWORK FUNCTION MANAGER FUNCTIONALITY, PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2017/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE TRAÇAGE ET/OU DE SURVEILLANCE DE NOEUDS D'UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION, RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION, UNE PLURALITÉ DE MACHINES VIRTUELLES, UNE FONCTIONNALITÉ DE GESTION DE FONCTION DE RÉSEAU VIRTUEL, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET PRODUIT LOGICIEL | [2017/34] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/14] | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2016 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | IE | 16.02.2020 | LU | 16.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.02.2016 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2015024838 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [Y] 8 * abstract;; figures 1-4 * * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 26 *[A] 1-7,9-14; | [XYI] - MESSINA FABRIZIO ET AL, "An Agent Based Architecture for VM Software Tracking in Cloud Federations", 2014 EIGHTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPLEX, INTELLIGENT AND SOFTWARE INTENSIVE SYSTEMS, IEEE, (20140702), doi:10.1109/CISIS.2014.66, pages 463 - 468, XP032653619 [X] 1,10-14 * the whole document * [Y] 8 [I] 2-7,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CISIS.2014.66 | [YA] - SPIRENT COMMUNICATIONS, "Draft - DGS/NFV-REL004 v0.2.0 (GS NFV-REL 004 ) Active Monitoring and Failure Detection in NFV Environments", vol. NFV Network Functions Virtualisation, no. 2 0, (20160115), pages 1 - 69, ETSI DRAFT; NFV(16)000036, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, URL: docbox.etsi.org\ISG\NFV\05-CONTRIBUTIONS\2016\NFV(16)000036_Draft_-_DGS_NFV-REL004_v0_2_0__GS_NFV-REL_004____Active_Moni.zip\NFV-REL004v020_marked1.docx, (20160115), XP014265125 [Y] 8 * Scope Chapters 5-7, 9 * [A] 1-7,9-14 |