EP3090622 - BALLING PRESS FOR AGRICULTURAL HARVESTED MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PÖTTINGER Landtechnik GmbH Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleesadl, Johann Mitterfeld 94 4181 Oberneukirchen / AT | 02 /
Lackner, Christian Michaelsbergstraße 5 4060 Leonding / AT | 03 /
Bumberger, Rainer Harrau 2 4141 Pfarrkirchen / AT | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2016/45] | Application number, filing date | 16156655.9 | 22.02.2016 | [2016/45] | Priority number, date | DE20152003273U | 04.05.2015 Original published format: DE 202015003273 U | [2016/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090622 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3090622 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/07, A01F15/12, A01F15/14 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
A01F15/0715 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2016/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BALLENPRESSE FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES ERNTEGUT | [2016/45] | English: | BALLING PRESS FOR AGRICULTURAL HARVESTED MATERIALS | [2016/45] | French: | PRESSE À BALLES POUR RÉCOLTE AGRICOLE | [2017/50] |
Former [2016/45] | PRESSE A BALLES POUR RECOLTE AGRICOLE | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 16.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2016 | AL | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | MT | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.02.2016 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MT | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0978231 (FORD NEW HOLLAND NV [BE]) [YD] 6,14,15 * paragraph [0001]; figures 2, 4 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] *; | [XYI]WO2005096801 (OHG ING A FERABOLI S P A [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,11-13 * page 6 - page 9; figures 1-11 * * page 12 * [Y] 6,7,14,15 [I] 4,9,10; | [YD]EP1776860 (KVERNELAND ASA [NO]) [YD] 7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]EP2430904 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2-6 * | by applicant | EP0978231 | DE10243294 | DE102004001773 | EP1776860 |