EP3081351 - HAND-HELD ROBOT CONTROL APPARATUS, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Deutschland GmbH Zugspitzstraße 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2016/42] | For all designated states KUKA Roboter GmbH Zugspitzstrasse 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEDEL, Martin 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2023/11] |
Former [2016/42] | 01 /
RIEDEL, Martin Insterburgstr. 5 86165 Augsburg / DE | Representative(s) | Böss, Dieter Alexander, et al Schirmgasse 268 84028 Landshut / DE | [2023/11] |
Former [2016/42] | Patentanwälte Funk & Böss GbR Sigmundstraße 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16163812.7 | 05.04.2016 | [2016/42] | Priority number, date | DE201510206578 | 13.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015206578 | [2016/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3081351 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3081351 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3081351 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B25J13/02, B25J13/06, B25J9/16 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
B25J13/06 (EP,KR,US);
B25J13/025 (CN);
B25J13/02 (US);
B25J13/065 (CN,KR);
B25J9/1689 (US);
G06F3/01 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | B25J19/06, B25J13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROBOTER-BEDIENHANDGERÄT, SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2016/42] | English: | HAND-HELD ROBOT CONTROL APPARATUS, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2016/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ROBOTISE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2016/42] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | IE | 05.04.2023 | LU | 05.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 15.03.2023 | |
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0171878 (KUKA DEV LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * figures 2,3,4 * * page 6, line 3 - line 17 *; | [A]WO02078913 (ABB AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [AD]DE102010025781 (KUKA LAB GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011118310 (ENGEL AUSTRIA GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y]US2013161967 (JARRETT JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 16,17 * abstract *; | [XY]US2015051736 (MU SHAO-LONG [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * [Y] 16,17 | by applicant | DE102010025781 |