EP3123879 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altria Client Services LLC 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, VA 23230 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Altria Client Services LLC 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, Virginia 23230 / US | ||
Former [2017/05] | For all designated states Altria Client Services Inc. 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, VA 23230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCKER, Christopher S. 11718 Explorer Terrace Midlothian, VA 23114 / US | 02 /
JORDAN, Geoffrey, Brandon 8036 Kentucky Derby Drive Midlothian, VA 23112 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Barry, S. 9751 James Crest Drive Hopewel, VA 23860 / US | 04 /
ROSTAMI, Ali, A. 12032 Stonewick Place Glen Allen, VA 23059 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2017/05] | 01 /
TUCKER, Christopher S. 11718 Explorer Terrace Midlothian, VA Virginia 23114 / US | ||
02 /
JORDAN, Geoffrey, Brandon 8036 Kentucky Derby Drive Midlothian, VA Virginia 23112 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Barry, S. 9751 James Crest Drive Hopewel, VA Virginia 23860 / US | |||
04 /
ROSTAMI, Ali, A. 12032 Stonewick Place Glen Allen, VA Virginia 23059 / US | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/12] |
Former [2017/05] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16165056.9 | 31.01.2013 | [2017/05] | Priority number, date | US201261593004P | 31.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261593004 P | US201313741217 | 14.01.2013 Original published format: US201313741217 | [2017/05] | Previously filed application, date | WO2013US24215 | 31.01.2013 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3123879 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3123879 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/48, A61M11/04, A61M15/06 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A24F47/00 (IL);
A24F7/00 (IL,RU);
A24F40/46 (IL,KR);
A61M11/042 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A24B15/167 (KR);
A24B15/186 (KR);
A24B15/243 (KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24F40/40 (IL,US);
A24F40/44 (IL,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24F40/70 (IL,US);
A61M11/001 (IL,US);
A61M11/003 (IL,US);
A61M11/04 (IL,US);
A61M15/002 (EP,CN,IL,US);
H01C17/00 (IL,US);
H05B1/0244 (IL,US);
H05B3/0014 (IL,US);
H05B3/10 (IL,US);
H05B3/12 (IL,US);
H05B3/16 (IL,US);
H05B3/42 (IL,US);
H05B3/44 (IL,US);
A61M2016/0018 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61M2016/0024 (KR);
A61M2021/0016 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M2205/8268 (IL,US);
A61M2209/02 (EP,CN,IL,US);
F04C2270/0421 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/05] | A24F47/00, A61M15/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2017/05] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2017/05] | French: | CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13744358.6 / EP2809180 | Divisional application(s) | EP24159503.2 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006191546 (TAKANO SHUSEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2007267032 (SHAN YANSONG [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0055] , [0057] *; | [A]US2011094523 (THORENS MICHEL [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011120455 (MURPHY JAMES [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN201860753U (SHENZHEN SHIMEITE SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2011146372 (MINSKOFF NOAH MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0158] , [0159] , [0161] , [0165] , [0179] , [0188] , [0194] *; | [A]US2011303231 (LI YONGHAI [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5595706 |