|
10.05.2023 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
04.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2022 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2022 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2022 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.10.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Invitation to file claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
363 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
115 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
418 |