EP3133541 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROMPTING GEAR SHIFTING OF BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Rui c/o Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/08] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16169276.9 | 12.05.2016 | [2017/08] | Priority number, date | CN201510512988 | 19.08.2015 Original published format: CN201510512988 | [2017/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3133541 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, B62M25/00 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
B62J45/416 (EP,RU,US);
B62M25/00 (RU);
B62J45/10 (EP,US);
B62J45/412 (EP,RU,US);
B62J6/01 (US);
F16H63/42 (US);
G06Q10/06 (RU);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US);
G07C5/08 (US);
B62M2025/003 (US);
B62M9/123 (EP,US);
B62M9/133 (EP,US);
F16H2063/426 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2017/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFFORDERUNG ZUR GANGSCHALTUNG EINES FAHRRADES | [2017/08] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROMPTING GEAR SHIFTING OF BICYCLE | [2017/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DEMANDER UN CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE DE BICYCLETTE | [2017/08] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.03.2021 | 02.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/29] | 14.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0527864 (E B T INC [US]) [I] 1-14 * page 5, paragraph 36 - page 19, paragraph 43 * * figure - *; | [I]US6047230 (SPENCER MARC D [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 21 ** figure 2 *; | [I]US2010198453 (DOROGUSKER JESSE L [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 21 - page 14, paragraph 104 * * figure - *; | [I]US2014371953 (MILLER CRAIG M [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 1, paragraphs 5-9 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 42 * * figure - * |