|
07.02.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
109 |
|
07.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
109 |
|
25.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.08.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.05.2020 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.12.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
F3203 Composition of the Board (J) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
228 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
118 |