EP3290254 - BIDIRECTIONAL ONBOARD ELECTRICAL POWER CONVERTER AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2018/10] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Echkilev, Nikolaj Am Sülzhof 49 41542 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
Wellner, Andreas Breiten Dyk 107 f 47803 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Wu, Xiao Qiang Auf D. Kempener Platte 46 47804 Krefeld / DE | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16186575.3 | 31.08.2016 | [2018/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290254 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60L1/00, H02M3/335, H02J7/34 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H02J7/34 (EP);
B60L53/20 (EP);
B60L9/18 (EP);
H02M3/33561 (EP);
H02M3/33584 (EP);
B60L2210/10 (EP);
B60L2210/40 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T10/92 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALER BORDNETZUMRICHTER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2018/10] | English: | BIDIRECTIONAL ONBOARD ELECTRICAL POWER CONVERTER AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2018/10] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE RESEAU DE BORD BIDIRECTIONNEL ET SON PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2728735 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0059] *; | [X]EP2567856 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figure 3 *; | [X]DE102009007737 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE112014004859T (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * paragraph [0054]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]EP3023291 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 * |