EP3151016 - DETERMINING ROTATIONAL SPEED OR DIRECTION OF A BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOD, Christopher c/o IP Department Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue, Filton Bristol, Avon BS34 7PA / GB | 02 /
CIPULLO, Alessio c/o IP Department Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue, Filton Bristol, Avon BS34 7PA / GB | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16187491.2 | 06.09.2016 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | GB20150015917 | 08.09.2015 Original published format: GB 201515917 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3151016 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3151016 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/487, G01P3/486, G01P13/04 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
G01P3/486 (EP,US);
G01P3/44 (CN,GB,US);
G01P13/00 (GB);
G01P13/04 (CN);
G01P13/045 (EP,US);
G01P3/36 (US);
G01P3/487 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER DREHGESCHWINDIGKEIT ODER- RICHTUNG EINES KÖRPERS | [2017/14] | English: | DETERMINING ROTATIONAL SPEED OR DIRECTION OF A BODY | [2017/14] | French: | DETERMINATION DE LA VITESSE DE ROTATION OU DE LA DIRECTION D'UN CORPS | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2001249141 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1-5,12,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] * [Y] 1-5,9,12,14-16; | [XY]JP2003344101 (NSK LTD) [X] 1-5,9,12,16 * paragraph [0001]; figures 3,4,5,9,10,; claims 1,2,4,5 *[Y] 1-5,9,12,14-16; | [XY]JP2007232606 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 1-5,12,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0025] * [Y] 1-5,9,12,14-16; | [XY]US2009102467 (SNELL PAUL W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0030] - [0036]; figures 7,8 * [Y] 1-5,9,12,14-16 |