EP3261298 - METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING A REAL-TIME INDUSTRIAL INTERNET FIELD BROADBAND BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyland Technology Co., Ltd. F15 Building 2 No. 30 Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jianfeng F15, Building 2 No. 30 Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing, 100041 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Zhiwei F15, Building 2 No. 30 Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing, 100041 / CN | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 16188040.6 | 09.09.2016 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | CN201610466726 | 23.06.2016 Original published format: CN201610466726 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261298 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261298 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, H04L12/40, H04L12/54 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
G06F13/426 (EP,US);
G05B19/4185 (CN);
H04L12/2801 (US);
H04L12/40 (EP,US);
H04L12/40013 (EP,US);
H04L12/40078 (US);
H04L12/40123 (US);
H04L12/56 (US);
G05B2219/33139 (CN);
Y02P90/02 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/52] | H04L12/40, H04L12/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTZEIT INDUSTRIAL BREITBAND-INTERNET-FIELD BUS FÜHRUNGS | [2019/51] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING A REAL-TIME INDUSTRIAL INTERNET FIELD BROADBAND BUS | [2017/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN OEUVRE D' UN BUS INDUSTRIEL EN TEMPS RÉEL INTERNET HAUT DEBIT | [2017/52] |
Former [2017/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTZEIT INDUSTRIAL-BREITBAND-INTERNET-FIELDBUSFÜHRUNG | Examination procedure | 09.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 09.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2016 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | IE | 09.09.2020 | LU | 09.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 09.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 09.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 09.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 09.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3856993 (CLOSS F, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - line 40 * * column 2, line 50 - line 60 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 46 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5960001 (SHAFFER SHMUEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - line 25 * * column 3, line 14 - line 31 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 22 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line l * * column 6, line 53 - line 62 * * claims 1-20 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | CN101778025B | - "CAN BUS TECHNOLOGY AND ITS APPLICATION", MANUFACTURING AUTOMATION | - "A STUDY ON INTUSTRIAL ETHERNET PROTOCAL BASED ON ETHERCAT", CHINESE SELECTED MASTER'S DISSERTATION ELECTRONIC JOURNAL |