EP3187367 - LOCKABLE ARMREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windsor Machine and Stamping 2009 Ltd 5725 Outer Drive Windsor, ON N9A 6J3 / CA | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PURVES, Robert 5725 Outer Drive Windsor ON N9A 6J3 / CA | 02 /
KAYAHARA, Evan 5725 Outer Drive Windsor ON N9A 6J3 / CA | 03 /
LITTLE, Mark Leonard 5725 Outer Drive Windsor ON N9A 6J3 / CA | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16193446.8 | 12.10.2016 | [2017/27] | Priority number, date | US201562240898P | 13.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562240898 P | US201615283935 | 03.10.2016 Original published format: US201615283935 | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3187367 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/42 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
B60N2/433 (EP,US);
B60N2/4249 (US);
B60N2/753 (EP,US);
B60N3/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/27] | B60N2/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELBARE ARMLEHNE | [2017/27] | English: | LOCKABLE ARMREST | [2017/27] | French: | ACCOUDOIR VERROUILLABLE | [2017/27] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 24.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH0569771 (DELTA KOGYO CO) [X] 1,2 * See Machine Translation, paragraphs 22, 32, 33, 35 and claims 1-5;; figure - * [Y] 5 [I] 3,4,6,7; | [Y]US5489143 (ADACHI TAKAO [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 2, lines 6-8; figure - *; | [A]KR20020075041 (KIA MOTORS CORP [KR]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]EP1375794 (ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYS [GB]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 * |