EP3190106 - DESFERRITHIOCIN POLYETHER ANALOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, FL 32611 / US | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergeron, Raymond J 6220 Northwest 56th Lane Gainesville, Florida 32653 / US | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2017/28] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16196408.5 | 22.03.2006 | [2017/28] | Priority number, date | US20050668045P | 04.04.2005 Original published format: US 668045 P | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3190106 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3190106 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/10, A61K31/426, A61P39/04 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
C07D277/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/04 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DESFERRITHIOCINPOLYETHER-ANALOGA | [2017/28] | English: | DESFERRITHIOCIN POLYETHER ANALOGUES | [2017/28] | French: | ANALOGUES DE POLYÉTHER DE DESFERRITHIOCINE | [2017/28] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06739627.5 / EP1866296 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2006 | CY | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 22.03.2006 | |
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | EE | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | EE | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6083966 (BERGERON JR RAYMOND J [US]) [AD] 1-15 * column 1, lines 16-18 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 5 * * column 5, Formula * * column 5, line 25 * * Example 2 *; | [A]WO2005023310 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [T] - BERGERON, RAYMOND J. ET AL, "(S)-4,5-Dihydro-2-(2-hydroxy-4-hydroxyphenyl)-4-methyl-4- thiazolecarboxylic Acid Polyethers: A Solution to Nephrotoxicity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON; US, (2006), vol. 49, no. 9, pages 2772 - 2783, XP002391776 [T] 1-15 * page 2773, right-hand column, paragraph 2 * * page 2776, Table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0508944 | by applicant | US6083966 | US6521652 | US6525080 | US6559315 | US2003236417 | US2004044220 | WO2004017959 | US2004132789 | - BERGERON, R.J., J. MED CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 95 - 108 | - BERGERON, R.J. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1991), vol. 34, pages 2072 - 2078 | - BERGERON, R.J. ET AL., "Methoxylation of Desazadesferrithiocin Analogues: Enhanced Iron Clearing Efficiency", J. MED. CHEM., (2003), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1021/jm020412d, pages 1470 - 1477, XP002265510 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm020412d | - BERGERON ET AL., J. MED CHEM., (2005), vol. 48, pages 821 - 831 |