EP3188378 - ROUTING BETWEEN NODES IN A SATELLITE SYSTEM THROUGH A SATELLITE OR THROUGH A SATELLITE AND A CENTRAL STATION. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/27] | ROUTING BETWEEN NODES IN A SATELLITE SYSTEM THROUGH A SATELLITE OR THROUGH A SATELLITE AND A CENTRAL STATION | ||
[2018/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOULIE, Antoine Thales Communications & Security Sas 4 avenue des Louvresses 92622 Gennevilliers Cedex / FR | 02 /
TOURET, Marc Thales Communications & Security Sas 4 avenue des Louvresses 92622 Gennevilliers Cedex / FR | 03 /
CHEVALLIER, Michel Thales Communications & Security Sas 4 avenue des Louvresses 92622 Gennevilliers Cedex / FR | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Priori, Enrico Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2018/39] |
Former [2017/27] | Priori, Enrico Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble «Visium» 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16204572.8 | 16.12.2016 | [2017/27] | Priority number, date | FR20150002716 | 29.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1502716 | [2017/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3188378 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3188378 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H04B7/18584 (EP);
H04B7/18513 (EP);
H04B7/18526 (EP);
H04B7/18563 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEITUNG ZWISCHEN KNOTEN IN EINER SATELLITENANORDNUNG DURCH EINEM SATELLITEN ODER DURCH EINEN SATELLITEN UND EINE ZENTRALSTATION. | [2018/15] | English: | ROUTING BETWEEN NODES IN A SATELLITE SYSTEM THROUGH A SATELLITE OR THROUGH A SATELLITE AND A CENTRAL STATION. | [2018/15] | French: | ROUTAGE ENTRE NOEUDS DANS UN SYSTÈME SATELLITAIRE À TRAVERS UN SATELLITE OU À TRAVERS UN SATELLITE ET UNE STATION CENTRALE. | [2018/15] |
Former [2017/27] | LEITUNG ZWISCHEN KNOTEN IN EINER SATELLITENANORDNUNG DURCH EINEM SATELLITEN ODER DURCH EINEN SATELLITEN UND EINE ZENTRALSTATION | ||
Former [2017/27] | ROUTING BETWEEN NODES IN A SATELLITE SYSTEM THROUGH A SATELLITE OR THROUGH A SATELLITE AND A CENTRAL STATION | ||
Former [2017/27] | ROUTAGE ENTRE NOEUDS DANS UN SYSTÈME SATELLITAIRE À TRAVERS UN SATELLITE OU À TRAVERS UN SATELLITE ET UNE STATION CENTRALE | Examination procedure | 16.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 09.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2016 | AL | 26.09.2018 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | IE | 16.12.2018 | LU | 16.12.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0077656 (COMSAT CORP [US]) [X] 1-17* page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 4 *; | [X]US2006126576 (DALE MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0 13] - [0022]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO2008077061 (VIASAT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] - [0018] *; | [X]EP2590455 (GILAT SATELLITE NETWORKS LTD [IL]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0 32] , [0 49] * | by applicant | EP2590455 |