EP3176428 - KITE GROUND STATION AND SYSTEM USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X Development LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDER LIND, Damon 2175 Monarch St. Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Oliver Ben Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 16205324.3 | 18.12.2012 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | US201161577039P | 18.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161577039 P | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176428 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F03D9/00, B64C31/06 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
B64C31/06 (EP,US);
B64F3/00 (EP);
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D5/04 (EP);
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
F05B2240/917 (EP);
F05B2240/921 (EP);
Y02E10/70 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | DRACHENBODENSTATION UND SYSTEM DAMIT | [2017/23] | English: | KITE GROUND STATION AND SYSTEM USING SAME | [2017/23] | French: | STATION TERRESTRE DE CERF-VOLANT ET SYSTÈME L'UTILISANT | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 01.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12859232.6 / EP2791504 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US7287481 (WRAGE STEPHAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-8,11-14 * column 13, lines 21-34; figure 10 * * column 14, lines 36-44; figure 13 *; | [Y]US2010117371 (IPPOLITO MASSIMO [IT], et al) [Y] 14* paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0148] *; | [YA]US7775483 (OLSON GAYLORD G [US]) [Y] 1,2,6-8,11-14 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, lines 45-47 * * column 3, lines 52-55 * [A] 3-5,9,10 |