EP3343192 - OPTICAL TORQUE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aros Electronics AB Östergårdsgatan 12 431 53 Mölndal / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Aros Electronics AB Ostergardsgatan 12 431 53 Mölndal / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLSTRÖM, Jerker Brandsbovägen 7 449 44 NOL / SE | 02 /
LUNDBERG, Per Klyfteråsen 58 427 35 Billdal / SE | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16207243.3 | 29.12.2016 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343192 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/12 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G01L3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER DREHMOMENTSENSOR | [2018/27] | English: | OPTICAL TORQUE SENSOR | [2018/27] | French: | CAPTEUR OPTIQUE DE COUPLE | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 13.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003010137 (DALTON BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0007] - paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2009323203 (ADAMS DENNIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO2016018225 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 10; figures 2A,6A * * page 11, line 28 - page 13, line 7 * | by applicant | US3938890 | US7784364 | US7559258 | KR20120044435 | JP5177890B | US6817528 | - SCHWARZE CR, "Risley prism scan-based approach to standoff trace explosive detection", OPT. ENG. 0001, vol. 53, no. 2, page 021110 | - M. OSTASZEWSKI; S. HARFORD; N. DOUGHTY; C. HOFFMAN; M. SANCHEX; D. GUTOW; R. PIERCE, "Risley prism beam pointer", PROC. SPIE FREE-SPACE LASER COMMUNICATIONS VI, (2006), vol. 6304, pages 630406.1 - 630406.10 |