EP3193233 - UNIVERSAL DEVICE-HOLDING CASE CONSTRUCTION WITH MAGNETIC FASTENER FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states World Richman Manufacturing Corporation 2505 Bath Road Elgin, IL 60124 / US | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarahut, Sirichai 98/2 Tearddumri Road 10300 Dusit - Bangkok / TH | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 16394003.4 | 19.08.2016 | [2017/29] | Priority number, date | US201514830495 | 19.08.2015 Original published format: US201514830495 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193233 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
G06F1/1628 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSEKONSTRUKTION MIT UNIVERSELLER VORRICHTUNGSHALTERUNG MIT MAGNETISCHER VERSCHLUSSFUNKTION | [2017/29] | English: | UNIVERSAL DEVICE-HOLDING CASE CONSTRUCTION WITH MAGNETIC FASTENER FEATURE | [2017/29] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE BOÎTIER DE SUPPORT DE DISPOSITIF UNIVERSEL AYANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION MAGNÉTIQUE | [2017/29] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 13.01.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011297566 (GALLAGHER KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0163]; figures 22-33 *; | [X]EP2602688 (ACER INC [TW]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2006187696 | US2008002369 | US2011261509 | US2012075789 | US8665044 | US8665045 | US8672126 |