EP3253252 - FURNITURE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foldsmart Ltd Kemp House City Road City of London London EC1V 2NX / GB | [2021/40] |
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states Vincent, Pelham James 165 Henley Road Caversham Reading, Berkshire RG4 6DN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINCENT, Pelham James 165 Henley Road Caversham, Reading RG4 6DN / GB | [2022/15] |
Former [2021/40] | 01 /
VINCENT, Pelham James 165 Henley Road Caversham Reading RG4 6DN / GB | ||
Former [2017/50] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | CSY London 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16701863.9 | 21.01.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016GB50137 | Priority number, date | GB20150001789 | 03.02.2015 Original published format: GB 201501789 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016124888 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253252 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3253252 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47B43/04, A47B61/00, A47B96/20, A47B43/02 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
A47B43/00 (EP,CN,GB);
A47B61/00 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A47B47/0075 (US);
A47B43/02 (US);
A47B47/00 (GB);
A47B77/00 (CN);
A47B88/00 (GB);
A47B88/941 (US);
A47B88/9412 (CN,GB);
A47B96/00 (GB);
A47B96/20 (GB,US);
A47B96/202 (GB,US);
A47B96/205 (GB);
A47F3/00 (GB);
A47F3/004 (GB);
A47B2096/203 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÖBELEINHEIT | [2017/50] | English: | FURNITURE UNIT | [2017/50] | French: | UNITÉ DE MEUBLE | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 08.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22160086.9 / EP4059379 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Request for further processing for: | 05.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2018 | 31.01.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.03.2022 | AT | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | ES | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | [2023/25] |
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US1342269 (STEWART IRVING N) [X] 1-4,9,10,13,15,17,19-21,26* the whole document *; | [XI]WO0137705 (STANLEY WORKS [US]) [X] 1-22,25,26 * the whole document * [I] 23,24; | [X]FR2817454 (DASSIS DANIEL [FR]) [X] 1-5,8,9,11-13,15,17-20,26 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004150302 (MCBRAYER JOHN H [US]) [X] 1-10,15,17-21,26 * the whole document *; | [XYI]FR2904924 (LAMBERT JULIEN [FR]) [X] 1-7,9,10,18-20,22,25,26 * the whole document * [Y] 23,24 [I] 8,11-14,16,17,21; | [X]GB2459246 (CROYDEX LTD [GB]) [X] 1-6,9,10,15,17-21,26 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2011115350 (TSAI PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-10,15,17,19-22,25,26 * the whole document * [Y] 23,24 [I] 11-14,16,18 | Examination | GB1043938 |