EP3253976 - A TWO-ARTICLE SYSTEM IN WHICH A FIRST ARTICLE HAS A THERMOSET COATING, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/50] | ARTICLES HAVING THERMOSET COATINGS AND COATING METHODS | ||
[2022/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nylok LLC 15260 Hallmark Court Macomb, MI 48042 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUPAR, Jeffrey, M. c/o Nylok LLC 15260 Hallmark Court Macomb, MI 48042 / US | 02 /
CISTERNINO, Franco, A. c/o Nylok LLC 15260 Hallmark Court Macomb, MI 48042 / US | 03 /
SESSA, Eugene, D. c/o Nylok LLC 15260 Hallmark Court Macomb, MI 48042 / US | 04 /
MONAHAN, Robin, F. c/o Nylok LLC 15260 Hallmark Court Macomb, MI 48042 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/11] |
Former [2017/50] | Somervell, Thomas Richard Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16707999.5 | 03.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US16280 | Priority number, date | US201562111495P | 03.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562111495 P | US201562257015P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562257015 P | US201615013294 | 02.02.2016 Original published format: US201615013294 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126766 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253976 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3253976 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16B33/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
F16B33/008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B05D1/12 (CN,KR,US);
C09D5/08 (CN,KR,US);
C09D163/00 (CN,KR,US);
C23F11/12 (CN,KR,US);
F16B33/00 (US);
F16B33/06 (CN,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN ZWEI-ARTIKEL-SYSTEM IN DEM EIN ERSTER ARTIKEL EINE DUROPLASTISCHE BESCHICHTUNG HAT, UND VERFAHREN | [2022/46] | English: | A TWO-ARTICLE SYSTEM IN WHICH A FIRST ARTICLE HAS A THERMOSET COATING, AND METHOD | [2022/46] | French: | UN SYSTÈME À DEUX ARTICLES DANS LEQUEL UN PREMIER ARTICLE A UN REVÊTEMENT THERMODURCISSABLE, ET PROCÉDÉ | [2022/46] |
Former [2017/50] | ARTIKEL MIT WÄRMEHÄRTENDEN BESCHICHTUNGEN UND BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2017/50] | ARTICLES HAVING THERMOSET COATINGS AND COATING METHODS | ||
Former [2017/50] | ARTICLES COMPORTANT DES REVÊTEMENTS THERMODURCIS ET PROCÉDÉS DE REVÊTEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 30.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8900087 (NYLOK FASTENER CORP [US]) [Y] 9,10,12,23,31,32,42,59,60* "Summary of the Invention" *; | [Y]GB2253163 (THERMOPLASTIC COATINGS LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 2,9,10,18,19,21,23,31,32,35,48,59,60,62 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6156392 (DUFFY RICHARD J [US], et al) [Y] 11,21,22,28,31,32,56,59,60 * column 3, lines 23-35 *; | [X]WO2005092517 (BOEING CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,21,25,27,31,32,34-36,38,40,52,59,60 * page 4, line 12 - page 6, line 20 *; | [XAY]US2011049834 (NATU PARAG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10,21,24,27-30,34-40,51,55-58 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] - [0029] * [A] 13-17,26,33,43-47,49,53,54,61 [Y] 4,7,8,11,12,18-20,22,23,40-42,48,50,62; | [Y]KR20140067547 (PARK CHANG JE [KR]) [Y] 20,50 * the whole document *; | [YD] - "3M Scotchkote TM Fusion Bonded Epoxy Coating 426", (20101231), URL: http://multimedia.3m.com/mws/media/198781O/3mtm-scotchkotetm-fbe-rebar-coating-426.pdf, (20160421), XP002756848 [YD] 2,3,7-10,21,23,28,32,35-37,40,41,56,60 * the whole document * | [YD] - "3M TM Scotchkote TM Fusion Bonded Epoxy Coating 413 Product Description", (20131231), URL: http://multimedia.3m.com/mws/media/75512O/3mtm-scotchkotetm-fbec-413.pdf, (20160421), XP002756849 [YD] 2-4,8-12,21,23,28,32,35-37,41,42,56,60 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004206635 | WO2004104430 | US6979161 | JP2007198544 |