EP3278318 - METHOD FOR SUPPLYING, ON A COMMUNICATION INTERFACE, HEIGHT DATA ABOUT AN OBJECT LOCATED IN THE SURROUNDINGS OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, SENSOR DEVICE, PROCESSING DEVICE AND MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIMBERGER, Markus Laiernstr. 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
BARIANT, Jean-Francois Laiernstr. 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 03 /
DURBEC, Axel Laiernstr. 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 04 /
MICHAEL, Anto Laiernstr. 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Pothmann, Karsten, et al Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH CDA-IP Laiernstraße 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 16713860.1 | 30.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016EP56893 | Priority number, date | DE201510104940 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: DE102015104940 | [2018/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016156377 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3278318 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60R1/00, G01C21/36, G01S13/93, G06K9/00, H04N7/18 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
G08G1/165 (EP,US);
G08G1/0962 (US);
G01C21/3837 (EP,US);
G01S15/86 (EP,US);
G01S15/87 (EP,US);
G01S15/89 (EP,US);
G01S15/931 (EP,US);
G06F18/251 (EP);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G08G1/16 (US);
G08G1/166 (EP,US);
G08G1/168 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON HÖHENINFORMATIONEN EINES OBJEKTS IN EINEM UMGEBUNGSBEREICH EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS AN EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSSCHNITTSTELLE, SENSOREINRICHTUNG, VERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2018/06] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPPLYING, ON A COMMUNICATION INTERFACE, HEIGHT DATA ABOUT AN OBJECT LOCATED IN THE SURROUNDINGS OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, SENSOR DEVICE, PROCESSING DEVICE AND MOTOR VEHICLE | [2018/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR METTRE À DISPOSITION, SUR UNE INTERFACE DE COMMUNICATION, DES INFORMATIONS CONCERNANT LA HAUTEUR D'UN OBJET DANS UNE ZONE ENVIRONNANTE D'UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR, DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT ET VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 28.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.03.2023 | 22.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/41] | 02.06.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102006036402 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3,8-10,12-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0032] , [0037] *[I] 2,4-7,11; | [XI]DE102008028222 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,8-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0009] , [0017] , [0020] * [I] 2,4-7; | [XI]DE102010018994 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,8-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0038] - [0040] - [0042] , [0043] , [0051] * [I] 2,4-7; | [XI]DE102011077333 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,8-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] - [0043] , [0044] , [0048] - [0050] * [I] 2,4-7 | by applicant | DE102006049626 | DE102009045286 |