EP3275254 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDOOR LOCALIZATION USING BEACONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PCMS Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Hyun Oh 48 Mabang-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06776 / KR | 02 /
SON, JuHyung 1114-302 11 Naesonjungang-ro Uiwang-si Gyeonggi-do 16021 / KR | 03 /
KWAK, Jin Sam 1113-1704 11 Naesonjungang-ro Uiwang-si Gyeonggi-do 16021 / KR | 04 /
KO, Geonjung 301-606 36 Dongtanwoncheon-ro 915beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16547 / KR | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16715400.4 | 18.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016US23214 | Priority number, date | US201562139311P | 27.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562139311 P | US201562139377P | 27.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562139377 P | US201562151793P | 23.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562151793 P | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016160376 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3275254 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3275254 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, G01S5/00, G01S1/02, G01S5/02, G01S5/14, // G01C21/12, G01S1/06 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
H04W4/33 (EP);
G01S5/0289 (US);
G01S1/024 (US);
G01S5/0242 (EP,US);
G01S5/14 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | H04W64/00, G01S5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INNEN LOKALISIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BEACONS | [2018/32] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDOOR LOCALIZATION USING BEACONS | [2018/05] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INTÉRIEUR LOCALISATION UTILISANT BALISES | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/05] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INNENRAUMLOKALISIERUNG MITHILFE VON BAKEN | ||
Former [2018/05] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE LOCALISATION À L'INTÉRIEUR DE BÂTIMENTS À L'AIDE DE BALISES | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 12.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19155236.3 / EP3499989 | EP21198922.3 / EP3955661 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2016 | AL | 13.02.2019 | AT | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | DK | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | ES | 13.02.2019 | FI | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | IT | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | PL | 13.02.2019 | RO | 13.02.2019 | RS | 13.02.2019 | SE | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | TR | 13.02.2019 | IE | 18.03.2019 | LU | 18.03.2019 | MT | 18.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | GR | 14.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | PT | 13.06.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.03.2016 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 13.02.2019 | |
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.02.2019 | |
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2439605 (ST MICROELECTRONICS RES & DEV [GB]) [A] 14* paragraphs [0001] - [0008]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]US2012182933 (BANDHAKAVI SINDHURA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 5,6 *; | [I]US2013260797 (JONES RUSSEL KIPP [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0013] - [0025] - [0081] - [0143]; figures 1,2,7,17, *; | [A]US2014228044 (JONES JR EDWARD FORSTER [US]) [A] 1-20 * figures 8a, 8b * |