EP3280820 - SPATIALLY DISTINGUISHED, MULTIPLEX NUCLEIC ACID ANALYSIS OF BIOLOGICAL SPECIMENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spatial Transcriptomics AB Södra Fiskartorpsvägen 15 C 11433 Stockholm / SE | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2019/14] |
Former [2018/07] | For all designated states Spatial Transcriptomics AB Tomtebodavägen 23A 17165 Solna / SE | ||
For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRISÉN, Jonas Bragevägen 5 114 26 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
STÅHL, Patrik Ljustergränd 1 116 68 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
LUNDEBERG, Joakim III-2-5 Torsvikssvän 20 181 34 Lidingö / SE | 04 /
CANN, Gordon M. 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 05 /
BAZARGAN, Leila 499 Illinois Street Suite 210 San Francisco, CA 94158-2509 / US | 06 /
ARAVANIS, Alex 1227 Oak Street San Mateo, CA / US | [2018/14] |
Former [2018/07] | 01 /
FRISÉN, Jonas Bragevägen 5 114 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
STÅHL, Patrik III-1-5 Fatburstrappan 18 T3:1 118 26 Stockholm / SE | |||
03 /
LUNDEBERG, Joakim III-2-5 Torsvikssvän 20 181 34 Lidingö / SE | |||
04 /
CANN, Gordon M. c/o Illumina Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
05 /
BAZARGAN, Leila c/o Illumina Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
06 /
ARAVANIS, Alex c/o Illumina Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2018/07] | Wilkins, Christopher George Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16721643.1 | 04.04.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016EP57355 | Priority number, date | US201562145874P | 10.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562145874 P | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016162309 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3280820 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3280820 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6841 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (CN,US);
C12N15/1065 (US);
C12Q1/6874 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
B01L2300/0877 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2525/179, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2525/173, C12Q2543/101, C12Q2565/515, C12Q2525/131 (CN);
C12Q1/6841, C12Q2525/131, C12Q2525/173, C12Q2525/179, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2565/515 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874, C12Q2525/131, C12Q2525/173, C12Q2525/179, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2543/101, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2565/515 (EP);
C12Q1/6874, C12Q2525/131, C12Q2525/173, C12Q2525/179, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2543/10, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2565/515 (US);
C12Q1/6874, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2525/179, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2525/173, C12Q2543/101, C12Q2565/515, C12Q2525/131 (CN)
(-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÄUMLICH GETRENNTE MULTIPLEX-NUKLEINSÄUREANALYSE VON BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN | [2018/07] | English: | SPATIALLY DISTINGUISHED, MULTIPLEX NUCLEIC ACID ANALYSIS OF BIOLOGICAL SPECIMENS | [2018/07] | French: | ANALYSE DE PLUSIEURS ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES SPATIALEMENT DIFFÉRENCIÉS DE SPÉCIMENS BIOLOGIQUES | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 15.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19159432.4 / EP3530752 | EP21164281.4 / EP3901281 | EP21164322.6 / EP3901282 | EP22190953.4 / EP4151748 | EP22190961.7 / EP4119677 | EP23195081.7 / EP4282977 | EP23212100.4 / EP4321627 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2016 | AL | 26.06.2019 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | NL | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | IE | 04.04.2020 | LU | 04.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 04.04.2016 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2013150083 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-105 * page 45 *; | [A]WO2014060483 (SPATIAL TRANSCRIPTOMICS AB [SE]) [A] 1-105 * page 30; example 6 *; | [A] - Crosetto, "Spatially resolved transcriptomics and beyond", Nature Review Genetics, (20150101), pages 57 - 66, URL: http://www.nature.com/nrg/journal/v16/n1/pdf/nrg3832.pdf, (20160629), XP055284555 [A] 1-105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg3832 | by applicant | WO8910977 | WO9106678 | US5130238 | US5455166 | US5599675 | US5641658 | US5750341 | WO0063437 | US6210891 | US6214587 | US6258568 | US6266459 | US6274320 | US6355431 | US2002055100 | US2002150909 | US6565727 | US2003205632 | US2004002090 | WO2004018497 | US2004096853 | US6770441 | US6773566 | WO2005010145 | US2005037393 | US6859570 | US2005064460 | US2005130173 | US6911132 | US2005179746 | US2005191698 | US6977033 | US2006039823 | US7052244 | US7057026 | US2006164490 | US2006194331 | US7115400 | US7163612 | US2007023292 | US7211414 | US2007099208 | US2007128624 | US7244559 | WO2007120241 | WO2007123744 | US7315019 | US2008009420 | US7329492 | US7328979 | US2008108082 | US2008124252 | US7405281 | WO2008093098 | US2009026082 | US2009127589 | US7547380 | US2009192044 | US7595883 | US2009283407 | US2009321262 | US7641779 | US2010096266 | US2010111768 | US2010120098 | US2010137143 | US2010282617 | US2011048951 | US2011059865 | US7960120 | WO2012058096 | US8288103 | US8460865 | US8486625 | US8637242 | US2014066318 | US2014079923 | US8778849 | US2014243224 | WO2014142841 | US8895249 | US2015005447 | US8951781 | - BENTLEY ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 456, pages 53 - 59 | - THORNTON, ANN. REV. MATER. SCI., (1977), vol. 7, pages 239 - 60 | - DRESSMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 8817 - 8822 | - LIZARDI ET AL., NAT. GENET, (1998), vol. 19, pages 225 - 232 | - DEAN ET AL., PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 5261 - 66 | - LAGE ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 13, pages 294 - 307 | - WALKER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 1691 - 96 | - RONAGHI ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 242, no. 1, pages 84 - 9 | - RONAGHI, GENOME RES., (2001), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 3 - 11 | - RONAGHI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, no. 5375, page 363 | - SHENDURE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1728 - 1732 | - BAINS ET AL., JOURNAL OF THEORETICAL BIOLOGY, (1988), vol. 135, no. 3, pages 303 - 7 | - DRMANAC ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 54 - 58 | - FODOR ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 251, no. 4995, pages 767 - 773 | - LEVENE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, pages 682 - 686 | - LUNDQUIST ET AL., OPT. LETT., (2008), vol. 33, pages 1026 - 1028 | - KORLACH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 1176 - 1181 | - GUNDERSON ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 14, pages 870 - 877 | - DHINDSA ET AL., "Virtual Electrowetting Channels: Electronic Liquid Transport with Continuous Channel Functionality", LAB CHIP, (2010), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1039/b925278a, pages 832 - 836, XP007912321 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b925278a |