EP3330774 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND FUNCTIONING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Song No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
NAGAYAMA, Kazuyoshi No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 16726473.8 | 07.01.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016CN70354 | Priority number, date | CN201510451026 | 28.07.2015 Original published format: CN201510451026 | [2018/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017016195 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3330774 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3330774 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22, H04N13/373, H04N13/371 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
G02B30/30 (EP);
G02B30/26 (CN);
H04N13/327 (US);
G02B30/27 (US);
H04N13/302 (US);
H04N13/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/356 (EP,US);
H04N13/371 (EP,US);
H04N13/373 (EP,US);
H04N2213/001 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | G02B27/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND FUNKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/23] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND FUNCTIONING METHOD THEREOF | [2018/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2016 | Translation filed | 13.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2016 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 13.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2016 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9505052 (SORENSEN JENS OLE [US]) [A] 6,7,11,12* page 5, line 5 - line 17 *; | [Y]US2009207124 (PARK JONG-WOUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 3,10 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0079] *; | [XYI]US2013053100 (SONG CHANG JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044] * [Y] 3,10 [I] 2,4-8,11-13 | International search | [Y]US6195205 (FARIS SADEG [US]) [Y] 1-2, 6-7, 9, 11-12 * , description, column 5, lines 43-64, and figures 9-11 *; | [A]CN1798351 (HITACHI DISPLAYS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101900884 (TIANMA MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN202472131U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-2, 6-7, 9, 11-12 * , description, paragraphs [0030]-[0039], and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN104297968 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-13* , the whole document *; | [PX]CN104991349 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-13 * , description, paragraphs [0051]-[0083], and figures 1-13 * |