EP3302154 - FOOTWEAR MANUFACTURING WITH A FLAT PATTERN UPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. Dutch Partnership One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILGORE, Bruce J. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16728488.4 | 25.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US34154 | Priority number, date | US201562168628P | 29.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562168628 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016196139 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302154 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3302154 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/04, A43D9/00, A43B9/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
A43B23/042 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B3/00 (CN);
A43B23/0235 (KR);
A43B23/025 (EP);
A43B23/026 (CN,KR);
A43B23/07 (CN);
A43B9/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43D111/00 (EP,CN,US);
A43D3/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHWERKSHERSTELLUNG MIT OBERSCHUH MIT FLACHEM MUSTER | [2018/15] | English: | FOOTWEAR MANUFACTURING WITH A FLAT PATTERN UPPER | [2018/15] | French: | FABRICATION DE CHAUSSURES À TIGE À MOTIF PLAT | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP20186616.7 / EP3750438 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2016 | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | IT | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | NL | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/28] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4031586 (VON DEN BENKEN ELISABETH, et al) [A] 1-16 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB1539886 (ASHWORTHS LTD) [A] 1-22 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2695808 (DELAGE ALAIN ETS [FR]) [A] 1-22* figure -; claim - *; | [YA]US5345638 (NISHIDA MAMORU [TW]) [Y] 17-22 * figure 1; claims 1,3 * [A] 1-16; | [Y]EP1042968 (FURUHASHI MASANOBU [JP]) [Y] 17-22 * figure -; claim - * |