EP3319620 - LACTOBACILLUS PARACASEI FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CONJUGATED LINOLEIC ACID, NUTRITIONAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING IT AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfasigma S.p.A. Via Ragazzi del '99, 5 40133 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Alfasigma S.p.A. Via Ragazzi del '99 n. 5 40133 Bologna / IT | ||
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Alfasigma S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 223 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISCOMI, Giuseppe Claudio c/o Alfasigma S.p.A. Via Ragazzi del '99 40133 Bologna / IT | 02 /
SFORZINI, Annalisa c/o Alfasigma S.p.A. Via Ragazzi del '99 40133 Bologna BO / IT | 03 /
MANGINO, Pierluigi c/o Alfasigma S.p.A. Via Ragazzi del '99 40133 Bologna BO / IT | 04 /
ELLI, Marina c/o AAT - Advanced Analytical Technologies Srl Via Martiri della Resistenza Galleria San Giuseppe 1 29122 Piacenza PC / IT | [2019/51] |
Former [2018/20] | 01 /
VISCOMI, Giuseppe Claudio Alfasigma S.p.A Via Ragazzi del' 99 40133 Bologna / IT | ||
02 /
SFORZINI, Annalisa c/o Alfasigma S.p.A. Via Ragazzi del' 99 40133 Bologna BO / IT | |||
03 /
MANGINO, Pierluigi c/o Alfasigma S.p.A. Via Ragazzi del' 99 40133 Bologna BO / IT | |||
04 /
ELLI, Marina c/o AAT - Advanced Analytical Technologies Srl Via Martiri della Resistenza Galleria San Giuseppe 1 29122 Piacenza PC / IT | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16739045.9 | 30.06.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016EP65245 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB02376 | 07.07.2015 Original published format: IT UB20152376 | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017005584 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319620 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3319620 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, C12R1/225, C12N1/20, A23L33/135, A61P3/00 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A61K9/009 (US);
A61K9/2095 (US);
A61P3/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | A61K35/747, A61P3/00, C12R1/225, C12N1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LACTOBACILLUS PARACASEI ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KONJUGIERTER LINOLSÄURE, ERNÄHRUNGS- UND ARZNEIPRÄPARATE DAMIT UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/20] | English: | LACTOBACILLUS PARACASEI FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CONJUGATED LINOLEIC ACID, NUTRITIONAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING IT AND USES THEREOF | [2018/20] | French: | LACTOBACILLUS PARACASEI POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDE LINOLÉIQUE CONJUGUÉ, PRÉPARATIONS NUTRITIONNELLES ET PHARMACEUTIQUES LE CONTENANT, ET UTILISATIONS DE CE DERNIERS | [2018/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 06.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2016 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IE | 30.06.2020 | LU | 30.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 30.06.2016 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.06.2016 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007074010 (TEAGASC DIARY PRODUCTS RES CT [IE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 36 - line 45; examples 1,2 * * page 4, line 21 - line 33 *; | [Y] - ILARIA CARAFA ET AL, "Identification and characterization of wild lactobacilli and pediococci from spontaneously fermented Mountain Cheese", FOOD MICROBIOLOGY., GB, (20150601), vol. 48, doi:10.1016/j.fm.2014.12.003, ISSN 0740-0020, pages 123 - 132, XP055298635 [Y] 1-13 * page 125, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fm.2014.12.003 | [YD] - OGAWA J ET AL, "Production of conjugated fatty acids by lactic acid bacteria", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 100, no. 4, ISSN 1389-1723, (20051001), pages 355 - 364, (20051001), XP027707241 [YD] 1-13 * page 357, column 1, paragraph 1; table 2 * | [Y] - ROMERO-PÉREZ G A ET AL, "A rapid method of screening lactic acid bacterial strains for conjugated linoleic acid production", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND AGROCHEMISTRY, TOKYO, JAPAN, vol. 77, no. 3, doi:10.1271/BBB.120709, ISSN 0916-8451, (20130101), pages 648 - 650, (20130307), XP002754919 [Y] 1-13 * page 649; tables 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.120709 | by applicant | - ECKER J. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPH. RES. COMM., (2009), vol. 388, pages 660 - 666 | - OGAWA J. ET AL., APPL. ENV. MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 67, page 1246 | - OGAWA J. ET AL., J. BIOSCIENCE BIOENG., (2005), vol. 100, no. 4, page 355 | - ROSBERG-CODY E. ET AL., APPL. ENV, MICROBIOL, (2004), vol. 70, no. 8, page 4635 | - COAKLEY M. ET AL., J. APPL. MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 94, page 138 | - ALONSO L. ET AL., J DIARY SCI., (2003), vol. 86, page 1941 | - GUSTAVO A. ET AL., BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2013), vol. 77, no. 3, pages 648 - 650 | - OGUZ GURSOY ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCES AND NUTRITION, vol. 63, no. 5, pages 610 - 615 | - ECKER J ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYSICAL. RES. COMM., (2009), vol. 388, page 660 | - OGAWA J., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 67, no. 3, pages 1246 - 1252 | - LIU P., BIOMED. & BIOTECHNOL., (2011), vol. 12811, pages 923 - 930 | - RYSER, E.T. ET AL., Listeria, Listeriosis and Food Safety (3rd ed.), CRC PRESS, (2007), pages 173 - 174 | - OGAWA, APPL. ENVR. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, page 1246 | - BARRET, APPL. ENVIRONMENT MICROBIOL., (2007), vol. 73, no. 7, page 2333 | - LIU, BIOMED. BIOTECHNOL., (2011), vol. 12811, page 923 | - LIU P ET AL., BIOMED. BIOTECHNOL., (2011), vol. 12811, page 923 | - KRAMER J. ET AL., AM. J. CLIN., (2004), vol. 79, page 1137 |