EP3248050 - HYBRID IMAGE-PUPIL OPTICAL REFORMATTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tornado Spectral Systems, Inc. Suite 402 555 Richmond Street West Toronto, ON M5V 3B1 / CA | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESROCHES, Brandon Joseph 55 Arbor Dr Brantford, Ontario N3P 2A7 / CA | 02 /
BEHR, Bradford Bartholomew 16000 Oak Hill Road Silver Spring, Maryland 20905-3928 / US | 03 /
MEADE, Jeffrey Thomas 904-4503 52nd Ave. Yellowknife, Northwest Territories X1A 3Y4 / CA | 04 /
BISMILLA, Yusuf Apt. 1320, 25 The Esplanade Toronto, Ontario M5E 1W5 / CA | 05 /
CENKO, Andrew T. 1808 N Edgewood St. Flagstaff, Arizona 86004 / US | [2020/23] |
Former [2017/48] | 01 /
DESROCHES, Brandon Joseph 55 Arbor Dr Brantford, Ontario N3P 2A7 / CA | ||
02 /
BEHR, Bradford Bartholomew 16000 Oak Hill Road Silver Spring, Maryland 20905-3928 / US | |||
03 /
MEADE, Jeffrey Thomas 904-4503 52nd Ave. Yellowknife, Northwest Territories X1A 3Y4 / CA | |||
04 /
BISMILLA, Yusuf Apt. 1320 25 The Esplanade Toronto, Ontario M5E 1W5 / CA | |||
05 /
CENKO, Andrew T. 1808 N Edgewood St. Flagstaff, Arizona 86004 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 16739706.6 | 21.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016CA50044 | Priority number, date | US201562105928P | 21.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562105928 P | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016115631 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3248050 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3248050 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/09, G01J3/02 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
G01J3/024 (EP,KR,US);
G01J3/0208 (EP,KR,US);
G01J3/021 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/30 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER REFORMATTER FÜR HYBRIDE BILD-PUPILLE-OPTIK | [2017/48] | English: | HYBRID IMAGE-PUPIL OPTICAL REFORMATTER | [2017/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFORMATAGE OPTIQUE IMAGE-PUPILLE HYBRIDE | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 31.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2016 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | ES | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | IT | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | LU | 21.01.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.01.2016 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 21.01.2016 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013176565 (MEADE JEFFREY T [CA], et al) [A] 1-26* figure 2 * | International search | [A]US3510203 (RICHARDSON ERIC H) [A] 1-26* (See whole document) *; | [A]US2012327409 (BEHR BRADFORD B [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * (See whole document) * | by applicant | US3510203 | US2012327409 | US2013176565 |