EP3373955 - PHARMACOLOGICAL USE OF AN IRISIN IN PANCREAS DISEASES OR DYSMETABOLIC CONDITIONS, WHEREIN A PANCREAS DAMAGE OCCURS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/38] | PHARMACOLOGICAL USE OF A MYOKINE ABLE TO PRESERVE THE FUNCTION AND MASS OF THE PANCREATIC CELLS UNDER DYSMETABOLIC CONDITIONS | ||
[2022/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universita' Degli Studi di Bari Piazza Umberto I N° 1 70121 Bari / IT | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIORGINO, Francesco c/o Universita' Degli Studi di Bari Dipartimento dell' Emergenza e dei Trapianti di Organi -DETO Piazza Giulio Cesare 11 I-70124 Bari / IT | 02 /
NATALICCHIO, Annalisa c/o Universita' Degli Studi di Bari Dipartimento dell' Emergenza e dei Trapianti di Organi -DETO Piazza Giulio Cesare 11 I-70124 Bari (BA) / IT | 03 /
MARRANO, Nicola c/o Universita' Degli Studi di Bari Dipartimento dell' Emergenza e dei Trapianti di Organi -DETO Piazza Giulio Cesare 11 I-70124 Bari (BA) / IT | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Trupiano, Federica Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 16760165.7 | 21.07.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016IB54339 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB05439 | 10.11.2015 Original published format: IT UB20155439 | [2018/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017081556 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3373955 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3373955 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/39, A61P1/18, A61P3/10 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAKOLOGISCHE VERWENDUNG EINES IRISINS BEI ERKRANKUNGEN DES PANKREAS ODER DYSMETABOLISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN BEI VORLIEGENDEM PANKREASSCHADEN | [2022/02] | English: | PHARMACOLOGICAL USE OF AN IRISIN IN PANCREAS DISEASES OR DYSMETABOLIC CONDITIONS, WHEREIN A PANCREAS DAMAGE OCCURS | [2022/02] | French: | UTILISATION PHARMACOLOGIQUE D'IRISINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES PANCRÉATIQUES, À L'OCCASION D'UNE LÉSION DU PANCREAS | [2022/02] |
Former [2018/38] | PHARMAKOLOGISCHE VERWENDUNG EINES MYOKINS ZUR BEWAHRUNG DER FUNKTION UND MASSE DER PANKREASZELLEN UNTER DYSMETABOLISCHEN BEDINGUNGEN | ||
Former [2018/38] | PHARMACOLOGICAL USE OF A MYOKINE ABLE TO PRESERVE THE FUNCTION AND MASS OF THE PANCREATIC CELLS UNDER DYSMETABOLIC CONDITIONS | ||
Former [2018/38] | UTILISATION PHARMACOLOGIQUE D'UNE MYOKINE CAPABLE DE PRÉSERVER LA FONCTION ET LA MASSE DES CELLULES PANCRÉATIQUES DANS DES CONDITIONS DYSMÉTABOLIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 24.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2016 | AL | 12.01.2022 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | IT | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | LU | 21.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.07.2016 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 21.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NO | 12.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]CN104623640 ; | [Y]CN104725500 ; | [Y]KR20150025480 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 71, Database accession no. 2015-46995C, XP002758306 & CN104623640 A 20150520 (UNIV NANJING MEDICAL) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 01, Database accession no. 2015-50447X, XP002758307 & CN104725500 A 20150624 (GUANGZHOU JIANKUN BIOLOGICAL TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 23, Database accession no. 2015-196649, XP002758308 & KR20150025480 A 20150310 (UNIV KYUNGPOOK NAT HOSPITAL) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - JIAN-JUN LIU ET AL, "Lower circulating irisin is associated with type 2 diabetes mellitus", JOURNAL OF DIABETES AND ITS COMPLICATIONS, US, (20130701), vol. 27, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.jdiacomp.2013.03.002, ISSN 1056-8727, pages 365 - 369, XP055276731 [Y] 1-10 *cf. abstract* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jdiacomp.2013.03.002 |