EP3349947 - COMMUNICATION UNIT FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE TOOL, ELECTRICAL MACHINE TOOL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZELL, Istvan Lilienstr. 17 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16763242.1 | 07.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016EP71037 | Priority number, date | DE201510217826 | 17.09.2015 Original published format: DE102015217826 | [2018/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017045980 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349947 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3349947 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
B25F5/00 (EP,US);
H04B11/00 (US);
B25B21/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE WERKZEUGMASCHINE, ELEKTROWERKZEUGSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2018/30] | English: | COMMUNICATION UNIT FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE TOOL, ELECTRICAL MACHINE TOOL SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2018/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION POUR UNE MACHINE-OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE, SYSTÈME D'OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 07.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2016 | AL | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | TR | 22.07.2020 | IE | 07.09.2020 | LU | 07.09.2020 | FR | 22.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | GB | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 07.09.2016 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
FR | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
GB | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.09.2016 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
FR | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
GB | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
FR | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
GB | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
FR | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
FR | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
FR | 22.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1136188 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0110] - [0117]; figure - *; | [XI]DE102013211228 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] - [0029]; figure - * [I] 9; | [I]WO2014198679 (ATLAS COPCO IND TECH AB [SE]) [I] 1,4-6 * pages 6,8,9; figure - *; | [A]EP2868437 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028]; figure - * | Examination | JPH04169000 | JP2006067726 |