EP3271114 - DRIVE SYSTEM WITH FULL SURFACE DRIVE CONTACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acument Intellectual Properties LLC 6125 Eighteen Mile Road Sterling Heights, MI 48314 / US | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSS, David, C. 1317 Harlem Boulevard Rockford, IL 61103 / US | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | [2022/37] |
Former [2018/04] | Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield South Yorkshire S9 2RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16765768.3 | 17.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016US22927 | Priority number, date | US201562135390P | 19.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562135390 P | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016149526 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3271114 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3271114 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25B15/00, F16B23/00, F16B35/04, F16B35/06 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
F16D1/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B25F5/00 (IL,KR);
B21K1/463 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B25B15/004 (EP,IL,US);
B25B15/005 (EP,IL,KR,US);
F16B23/003 (EP,IL,KR,US);
F16D2001/102 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM MIT VOLLFLÄCHENANTRIEBSKONTAKT | [2018/04] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM WITH FULL SURFACE DRIVE CONTACT | [2018/04] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À CONTACT D'ENTRAÎNEMENT SUR TOUTE LA SURFACE | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 08.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | LU | 17.03.2023 | [2024/02] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | EE | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | EE | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | HR | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 14.09.2022 | |
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 14.09.2022 | |
RS | 14.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5577871 (BRUGOLA GIANNANTONIO [IT]) [Y] 8 * page 2, line 51 - page 6, line 50; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]EP1025370 (CREARE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-13,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-11 * [Y] 3,4,7,8,10,14; | [I]US2003059233 (JANG KYUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,9,10* paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US2004149088 (YAMAMOTO KOUZUO [JP]) [Y] 4,10 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US2010129176 (KARUPAYA BALASINGAM [MY]) [Y] 3,7,14 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US2013068075 (STIEBITZ GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-6 * | International search | [Y]US5577871 (BRUGOLA GIANNANTONIO [IT]) [Y] 5, 7, 13 * entire document *; | [XY]US5957645 (STACY W DODD [US]) [X] 1-3, 9-11, 14, 16-18, 20 * entire document * [Y] 4-8, 12, 13, 15, 19; | [A]US2002039523 (HARTMANN GUNTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2004149088 (YAMAMOTO KOUZUO [JP]) [Y] 6, 15 * entire document *; | [A]US2007037123 (MANSUETO ROBERT F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010129176 (KARUPAYA BALASINGAM [MY]) [Y] 4, 12, 19 * entire document *; | [A]US2011203423 (DILLING GARY [US]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US2013068075 (STIEBITZ GUENTER [DE], et al) [Y] 8 * entire document * | Examination | US5957645 | EP1025370 | by applicant | US5577871 | EP1025370 | US2003059233 | US2004149088 | US2010129176 | US2013068075 |