EP3344825 - COMPONENT MADE OF HOLLOW GLASS BLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semadeni, Marco Chronenrain 12 8816 Hirzel / CH | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16767137.9 | 31.08.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016EP01465 | Priority number, date | CH20150001251 | 31.08.2015 Original published format: CH 12512015 | [2018/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017036593 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3344825 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3344825 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04C1/42, E04C2/54 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
E04C1/42 (EP,CH,US);
E04C2/546 (EP,CH,US);
E04C2/54 (US);
E04C2/543 (US);
H01G9/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUELEMENT AUS HOHLGLASBAUSTEINEN | [2018/28] | English: | COMPONENT MADE OF HOLLOW GLASS BLOCKS | [2018/28] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONSTRUCTION COMPOSÉ DE BRIQUES CREUSES EN VERRE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 23.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2016 | AL | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | IE | 31.08.2019 | LU | 31.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 31.08.2016 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 31.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.08.2016 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 31.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 31.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 31.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 31.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | HR | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]AT200308B (HOLZER ERWIN) [X] 1 * page 1, line 76 - page 2, line 16; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,4-6; | [XI]DE2263127 (SAINT GOBAIN) [X] 1,9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *[I] 10,11; | [XAI]EP0103192 (VER GLASWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 2, line 4 - line 17 * * page 4, line 19 - page 12, line 14; figures 1-7 * [A] 2,4-6 [I] 10,11; | [XAY]DE29721211U (OBERLAND GLAS [DE]) [X] 1,7-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 1, line 28 - line 31 * * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 17; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4-6 [Y] 3; | [XAY]EP1447491 (ROCHERE S A [FR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-7 * [A] 2,4-6 [Y] 3 |