EP3276325 - COMBUSTION PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Finedevice Co., Ltd. 6663-2 Funatsu Fujikawaguchiko-machi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamana-shi 401-0395 / JP | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states Citizen Finedevice Co., Ltd. 6663-2 Funatsu Fujikawaguchiko-machi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamana-shi 401-0395 / JP | ||
For all designated states Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuo c/o CITIZEN FINEDEVICE CO. LTD. 6663-2 Funatsu Fujikawaguchiko-machi Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0395 / JP | 02 /
IWASHITA Takashi c/o CITIZEN FINEDEVICE CO. LTD. 6663-2 Funatsu Fujikawaguchiko-machi Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0395 / JP | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 16768332.5 | 02.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016JP56500 | Priority number, date | JP20150061557 | 24.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015061557 | [2018/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016152429 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276325 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01L23/22, F02D35/00 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
G01L23/22 (EP,US);
F02D35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSDRUCKSENSOR | [2018/05] | English: | COMBUSTION PRESSURE SENSOR | [2018/05] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION DE COMBUSTION | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2017 | Translation filed | 18.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 18.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/09] | 26.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2021 | 08.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102012202058 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3 * figures 3,5 ** paragraph [0018] *; | [X]WO2014050999 (CITIZEN FINETECH MIYOTA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figures 1,11 * * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2014034641 (CITIZEN FINETECH MIYOTA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013118542 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & DE 112013000923 T & JP 2013-164027 A & US 2014/0367498 A1 *; | [A]JP2010242578 (DENSO CORP, et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & CN 101865059 A & DE 102010016261 A & US 2010/0252000 A1 *; | [A]JP2010509574 (Kistler Holding AG) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & AT 520966 T & EP 2087333 A & US 2010/0050775 A1 & WO 2008/055377 A2 *; | [A]JP2006300046 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & CN 1734076 A & EP 1624249 A2 & US 2006/0032472 A1 *; | [A]JP2003232268 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & EP 1335127 A2 & US 2003/0151014 A1 *; | [A]JP2002243571 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001330529 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000155062 (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |