EP3260792 - AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM CONTROL DEVICE, AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM, AIR CONDITIONING CONTROL PROGRAM, AND AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Thermal Systems, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Takahiro c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2019/31] |
Former [2017/52] | 01 /
KATO, Takahiro c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16768455.4 | 10.03.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016JP57550 | Priority number, date | JP20150064074 | 26.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015064074 | [2017/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016152552 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3260792 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3260792 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B13/00, F25B49/02, F24F11/89 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B13/00 (EP);
F25B2313/0294 (EP);
F25B2600/025 (EP);
F25B2600/2513 (EP);
F25B2700/1931 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/52] | F24F11/02, F25B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMATISIERUNGSSYSTEMSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KLIMATISIERUNGSSYSTEM, KLIMATISIERUNGSTEUERUNGSPROGRAMM UND KLIMATISIERUNGSSYSTEMSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/52] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM CONTROL DEVICE, AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM, AIR CONDITIONING CONTROL PROGRAM, AND AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM CONTROL METHOD | [2017/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR, SYSTÈME DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR, PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR | [2017/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2017 | Translation filed | 22.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 22.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 19.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2016 | AL | 31.07.2019 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | RS | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | NO | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | IE | 10.03.2020 | LU | 10.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | FR | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 10.03.2016 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IE | 10.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
LU | 10.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NO | 31.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000018685 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1158167 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]JP2003262385 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE69632094T (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP1956320 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0078] - [0088] - [0119] - [0134]; figures 1,5,9 * [I] 3,4; | [Y]WO2014156313 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0070]; figures 2,5,6 * | International search | [Y]JP2000018685 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0025] to [0036]; fig. 1 to 3, 7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2003254589 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2-6 * , paragraphs [0053] to [0058], [0062] to [0070]; fig. 2, 5 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003262385 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0004] to [0026]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008190759 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0039], [0048]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2014156313 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0029]; fig. 1, 3 to 4 (Family: none) * |