EP3350570 - PATH LENGTH CALIBRATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo Electron Scientific Instruments LLC 5225 Verona Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHMEAD, Damian, W. c/o 5225 Verona Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | 02 /
HOWARD, James, V. c/o 5225 Verona Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | 03 /
KIM, Kevin, K. c/o 5225 Verona Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | 04 /
BRAASCH, Andrew, Martin c/o 5225 Verona Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/31] |
Former [2018/30] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16770114.3 | 25.08.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016US48635 | Priority number, date | US201562220536P | 18.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562220536 P | US201662306793P | 11.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662306793 P | [2018/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017048475 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3350570 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3350570 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, G01N21/31, // G01D5/14 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
G01N21/0303 (EP,US);
G01N21/27 (US);
G01N21/31 (EP,US);
G01R33/07 (US);
G01R33/093 (US);
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01N2021/035 (EP,US);
G01N2021/036 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0668 (EP,US);
G01N2201/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/30] | G01N21/03, G01D5/00, G01N21/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFADLÄNGENKALIBRIERUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2018/30] | English: | PATH LENGTH CALIBRATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2018/30] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE DE LONGUEUR DE TRAJET | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 13.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 25.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20179928.5 / EP3828526 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 25.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2019 | Decision despatched | 25.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2016 | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | IT | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | NL | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | TR | 29.07.2020 | IE | 25.08.2020 | LU | 25.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006049826 (DANEMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 11,20 * page 70, line 27 - page 71, line 8 * * figure 44A *; | [Y]US7088095 (BUSCH NICHOLAS F [US]) [Y] 1-20 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 13 * * figure 1A *; | [Y]EP2166313 (SICK AG [DE]) [Y] 12,18 * paragraph [0032] ** figure 4 *; | [YD]US8223338 (ROBERTSON JR CHARLES W [US], et al) [YD] 1-20 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 12 * * column 4, line 1 - line 12 * * column 7, line 1 - column 9, line 38 * * column 10, line 7 - line 19 * * column 10, line 31 - line 32 * * figures 1A, 1B, 2A, 2B, 3A, 3B *; | [YD]US2014008539 (COFFIN JOHN MAGIE [US], et al) [YD] 1-20 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0018] - [0029] - [0050] - [0052] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US6628382 | US8223338 | US2014008539 |