EP3316719 - FOOTWEAR SOLE STRUCTURE WITH NONLINEAR BENDING STIFFNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. Dutch Partnership One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRIS, Bryan N. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 02 /
ORAND, Austin c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 03 /
SHEETS-SINGER, Alison c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 04 /
WEAST, Aaron B. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 16770431.1 | 15.09.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016US51912 | Priority number, date | US201562220633P | 18.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562220633 P | US201562220758P | 18.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562220758 P | US201562220638P | 18.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562220638 P | US201562220678P | 18.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562220678 P | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017048937 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316719 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3316719 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/14, A43B5/02 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
A43B13/141 (EP,US);
A43B13/04 (US);
A43B13/12 (US);
A43B13/127 (US);
A43B13/181 (US);
A43B13/186 (US);
A43B13/188 (US);
A43B13/223 (US);
A43B17/02 (US);
A43B23/026 (US);
A43B23/028 (US);
A43B5/02 (EP,US);
A43C15/16 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHSOHLENSTRUKTUR MIT NICHTLINEARER BIEGESTEIFIGKEIT | [2018/19] | English: | FOOTWEAR SOLE STRUCTURE WITH NONLINEAR BENDING STIFFNESS | [2018/19] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SEMELLE D'ARTICLE CHAUSSANT PRÉSENTANT UNE RÉSISTANCE À LA FLEXION NON LINÉAIRE | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 22.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2016 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | IE | 15.09.2020 | LU | 15.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 15.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 15.09.2020 | ||
LU | 15.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 15.09.2020 | ||
LU | 15.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 15.09.2020 | ||
LU | 15.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 15.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 15.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]FR892219 (CLAMOT) [X] 1,2,4,5,14-16 * page 2, column 2 - page 3, column 1 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6-13,17-20 [I] 3; | [A]WO2011005728 (CEDAR TECHNOLOGIES INTERNAT LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1,17* the whole document *; | [A]US8365444 (YOUNGS BRYAN KIME [US]) [A] 1,17 * column 5, line 3 - line 19 * * figures 2-3,9-13 * |