EP3267704 - METHOD FOR UNIFIED APPLICATION AUTHENTICATION IN TRUNKING SYSTEM, SERVER AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHENGDU TD TECH LTD. 3-5F, Bldg 3, C Area, Tianfu Software Zone 219 Tianhua 2nd Road Gaoxin District Chengdu Sichuan 610041 / CN | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Jianmiao 3-5F Building 3 C Area Tianfu Software Zone 219 Tianhua 2nd Road Gaoxin District Chengdu Sichuan 610041 / CN | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2018/02] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16771423.7 | 01.04.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016CN78339 | Priority number, date | CN201510154448 | 02.04.2015 Original published format: CN201510154448 | [2018/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016155668 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3267704 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3267704 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/10, H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W12/08, H04W60/00 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
H04L63/0815 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (US);
H04L63/10 (US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/02] | H04W4/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VEREINHEITLICHTEN ANWENDUNGSAUTHENTIFIZIERUNG IN EINEM BÜNDELFUNKSYSTEM, SERVER UND ENDGERÄT | [2018/02] | English: | METHOD FOR UNIFIED APPLICATION AUTHENTICATION IN TRUNKING SYSTEM, SERVER AND TERMINAL | [2018/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'APPLICATION UNIFIÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME À RESSOURCES PARTAGÉES, SERVEUR, ET TERMINAL | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2017 | Translation filed | 06.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 06.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CA2571255 (BCE INC [CA]) [X] 1,6,11,16 * page 7, line 26 - page 9, line 25; figures 1-9 *[I] 2-5,7-10,12-15,17-20; | [XI]EP2809042 (TELEFONICA DIGITAL ESPAÑA S L U [ES]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-13,16-18 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-4 * [I] 4,5,9,10,14,15,19,20 | International search | [A]US2007240206 (WU YONGMING [CN], et al) [A] 1-20* , the whole document *; | [A]CN102904895 (SHENZHEN HUIZHIJI INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN103051631 (G CLOUD TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs [0008]-[0017] and [0028]-[0042] *; | [A]CN103139168 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN103188248 (ASPIRE DIGITAL TECH SHENZHEN) [X] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs [0040]-[0086] and [0104]-[0132], and figures 4-8 * |