EP3347047 - EXPRESSION VECTOR DELIVERY SYSTEM AND USE THEREOF FOR INDUCING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States Of America, As Represented By The Secretary, Department Of Health And Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325, MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20852-7660 / US | For all designated states The Chancellor, Masters and Scholars of The University of Oxford University Offices Wellington Square Oxford, Oxfordshire OX1 2JD / GB | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDER, Robert Building 40 40 Convent Drive Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
LYNN, Geoffrey Building 40 40 Convent Drive Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 03 /
SEYMOUR, Leonard University Offices Wellington Square Oxford OX1 2JD / GB | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16775023.1 | 09.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016US51037 | Priority number, date | US201562215927P | 09.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562215927 P | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017044803 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347047 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K47/59 (US);
A61K47/6455 (US);
A61K47/65 (US);
A61K48/0041 (US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | EXPRESSIONSVEKTOR-ABGABESYSTEM UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG ZUR INDUZIERUNG EINER IMMUNANTWORT | [2018/29] | English: | EXPRESSION VECTOR DELIVERY SYSTEM AND USE THEREOF FOR INDUCING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE | [2018/29] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DE VECTEURS D'EXPRESSION ET UTILISATION DE CE DERNIER POUR INDUIRE UNE RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2010128303 (HYBRID BIOSYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,11,14-18,23-27,30-34,39-42,44,45,47-51 * page 2, line 16 - line 21 * * page 3, line 5 - line 25 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 12 * * page 9, line 8 - line 24 * * page 16, line 27 - page 17, line 19 * * page 18, line 27 - page 19, line 14 * * page 20, line 5 - line 21; example - * [I] 2,5,6,8-10,12,13,19-22,28,29,35-38,43,46,52-55; | [A]US2015037326 (BUTLER-RANSOHOFF JOHN-EDWARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-51 * page 1, paragraph 0001 * * page 2, paragraph 0023 * * page 3, paragraph 0033 * * page 11, paragraph 88 - paragraph 92 * * page 19, paragraph 164 - page 20, paragraph 167 * * page 27, paragraph 264 * * page 28, paragraph 270 - page 29, paragraph 276 * * page 30, paragraph 296 * * page 32, paragraph 316 - paragraph 317 * * page 35, paragraph 334 - paragraph 343 * * page 36, paragraph 361 - paragraph 365; example - *; | [A] - STONE GEOFFREY W ET AL, "Nanoparticle-Delivered Multimeric Soluble CD40L DNA Combined with Toll-Like Receptor Agonists as a Treatment for Melanoma", PLOS ONE, (200910), vol. 4, no. 10, ISSN 1932-6203, XP002765245 [A] 1-55 * page 2, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 2, column r, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 8, column r, paragraph 2 - page 10 * | [A] - OH Y-K ET AL, "Enhanced adjuvanticity of interleukin-2 plasmid DNA administered in polyethylenimine complexes", VACCINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030620), vol. 21, no. 21-22, doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(03)00178-6, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 2837 - 2843, XP004429682 [A] 1-51 * page 2837, column r, paragraph l - page 2838, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 2840, column l, paragraph 2 - page 2842, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(03)00178-6 | [I] - NIKUNJ M. SHUKLA ET AL, "Structure-Activity Relationships in Human Toll-Like Receptor 7-Active Imidazoquinoline Analogues", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20100610), vol. 53, no. 11, doi:10.1021/jm100358c, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4450 - 4465, XP055081984 [I] 52-55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm100358c | by applicant | US4501729 | US4652441 | US4675189 | US4677191 | US4689338 | US4728721 | US4880935 | US4917893 | US5122368 | US5622929 | US5824805 | US6214345 | US6518265 | US8323696 | - WALES ET AL., BIOCHEM SOC TRANS., (2007), vol. 35, pages 1501 - 1503 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - BERGE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, page 1 | - BITTER ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1987), vol. 153, pages 516 - 544 | - SHMUELI ET AL., J. VISUALIZED EXP., (2013), vol. 73, page E50176 | - GUERRERO CAZAREZ ET AL., ACS NANO, (2014), vol. 8, pages 5141 - 5153 | - DUBOWCHIK; WALKER, PHARM. THERAPEUTICS, (1999), vol. 83, pages 67 - 123 | - NEVILLE ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 14653 - 14661 | - THORPE ET AL., CANCER RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 5924 - 5931 | - PHILLIPS ET AL., CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, page 92809290 | - JOHNSON ET AL., ANTICANCER RES., (1995), vol. 15, pages 1387 - 1393 | - LAU ET AL., BIOORG-MED-CHEM., (1995), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 1299 - 1304 | - LAU ET AL., BIOORG-MED-CHEM., (1995), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 1305 - 1312 | - BAROUCH ET AL., J. VIROL, (2005), vol. 79, pages 8828 - 8834 | - AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (2013), vol. 104 | - FORDE ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY METHODS & CLINICAL DEVELOPMENT, (2014), vol. 1, page 14012 | - LEE ET AL., HUM VACCIN IMMUNOTHER., (2015), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 1889 - 1900 | - CZARNIECKI, M. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM, (2008), vol. 51, pages 6621 - 6626 | - GERSTER, J., F. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM, (2005), vol. 48, pages 3481 - 3491 | - SINGH, M. ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (2014), vol. 193, pages 4722 - 4731 | - BERGE ET AL., J. PHANN. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, page 1 | - MICHAEL ET AL., J. PHARMACY PHARMACOL., (1991), vol. 43, pages 1 - 5 | - GONDA, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1990), vol. 6, pages 273 - 313 | - RAEBURN ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL. METH., (1992), vol. 27, page 143 | - TOPALIAN ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2011), vol. 29, pages 4828 - 4836 | - ARANDA ET AL., ONCOIMMUNOLOGY, (2013), vol. 2, page E26621 | - YADAV ET AL., NATURE, (2014), vol. 515, pages 572 - 576 | - SHUKLA ET AL., J MED CHEM, (2010), vol. 53, pages 4450 - 4465 | - GERSTER ET AL., J MED CHEM, (2005), vol. 48, pages 3481 - 3491 | - RYU ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2014), vol. 136, pages 10823 - 10825 | - SHUKLA ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (2010), vol. 20, pages 6384 - 6386 | - SHUKL ET AL., J MED CHEM, (2010), vol. 53, pages 4450 - 4465 | - SHUKLA E, J MED CHEM, (2010), vol. 53, pages 4450 - 4465 | - LEBLEU ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (2014), vol. 50, pages 1836 - 1838 |